Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Magic Taco Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. and Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez, Magic Taco, Inc. and Magic Taco Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02799
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Magic Taco Inc ; served on 11/5/2018. (King, Jamie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez ; served on 11/5/2018. (King, Jamie)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (King, Jamie)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc re: #11 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer, (King, Jamie)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamie Renee King for David Michael Walsh IV on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (King, Jamie)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: By Monday, 12/17/2018, Plaintiff must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why local counsel has not yet appeared on its behalf. Failure to comply may result in sanctions. Show Cause Response due by 12/17/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/10/2018) (zkc)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 parties' Joint Motion for Telephone Rule 26(f) Conference. The Court hereby waives the face to face requirement and allows the parties to conduct the Rule 26(f) Conference telephonically. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 12/10/2018) (chmb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION Telephone Rule 26(f) Conference re #8 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 12/19/2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/28/2018) (svc)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Magic Taco Inc, Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez. (Helms, John) (Main Document 7 replaced to flatten on 11/29/2018) (epm).
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Magic Taco Inc, Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney John M Helms, Jr added to party Magic Taco Inc(pty:dft), Attorney John M Helms, Jr added to party Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez(pty:dft) (Helms, John)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (King, Jamie) Modified docket text on 10/26/2018 (zkc).
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Magic Taco Inc, Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez. (aaa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9530013) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Magic Taco Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lizbeth Torres-Ramirez
Represented By: John M Helms, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic Taco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magic Taco Inc
Represented By: John M Helms, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Represented By: David M Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?