Uniloc USA Inc et al v. ZTE (USA) Inc et al
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA Inc, Uniloc 2017 LLC and Uniloc Licensing USA LLC
Defendant: ZTE (USA) Inc and ZTE (TX) Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02839
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 37 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (epm)
December 6, 2018 Civil Case Terminated per #36 Stipulation of Dismissal. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (epm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 36 Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc Licensing USA LLC, Uniloc USA Inc. (Gannon, Kevin)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Keana Taylor and Upshaw PLLC are withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendants ZTE (USA) Inc. and ZTE (TX) Inc. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/19/2018) (ewd)
November 9, 2018 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Terminate ECF Notifications filed by ZTE (TX) Inc, ZTE (USA) Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Keana)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/8/2018) (zkc)
November 7, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ZTE (USA) Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate ZTE Corporation for ZTE (USA) Inc. (McMahon, Charles)
November 7, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ZTE (TX) Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate ZTE Corporation for ZTE (TX) Inc. (McMahon, Charles)
November 7, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by ZTE (TX) Inc, ZTE (USA) Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McMahon, Charles)
November 1, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Calli Anne Turner on behalf of ZTE (TX) Inc, ZTE (USA) Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Turner, Calli)
November 1, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay Reiziss on behalf of ZTE (TX) Inc, ZTE (USA) Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Reiziss, Jay)
November 1, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles M McMahon on behalf of ZTE (TX) Inc, ZTE (USA) Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McMahon, Charles)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: This matter is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Judge David C. Godbey. All future pleadings in this case shall be filed under Civil Action No. 3:18-cv-2839-N. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/29/2018) (aaa)
October 24, 2018 Filing 25 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mcrd/ala)
October 24, 2018 Filing 24 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
October 24, 2018 Filing 23 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00307. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
September 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 First MOTION Defendant ZTE's Unopposed Motion to Transfer by ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc. ORDERED that the case is transferred to the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/30/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 21 First MOTION Defendant ZTE's Unopposed Motion to Transfer by ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting ZTE's Unopposed Motion to Transfer to the NDTX)(Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 4, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 17 and 18, Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ZTE (TX), Inc. to 10/4/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ZTE (USA), Inc. to 10/4/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZTE (TX), Inc..( Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZTE (USA), Inc..( Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 4, 2018 FILED IN ERROR Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ZTE (TX), Inc. to 10/11/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) Modified on 9/4/2018 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
September 4, 2018 FILED IN ERROR Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ZTE (USA), Inc. to 10/11/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) Modified on 9/4/2018 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 18 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZTE (TX), Inc..( Taylor, Keana) Modified on 9/4/2018 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 17 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZTE (USA), Inc..( Taylor, Keana) Modified on 9/4/2018 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keana Theresa Taylor on behalf of ZTE (TX), Inc. (Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 31, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keana Theresa Taylor on behalf of ZTE (USA), Inc. (Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued as to ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/13/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/13/2018. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc 2017, LLC, Uniloc Licensing USA LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CF Uniloc Holdings LLC for Uniloc 2017, LLC; Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc., filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc 2017, LLC.(Gannon, Kevin) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Uniloc 2017, LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Latchford, Shawn) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Michael Vecchione on behalf of Uniloc 2017, LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Vecchione, Anthony) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Seth Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc 2017, LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Jacobs, Aaron) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc 2017, LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Gannon, Kevin) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul J Hayes on behalf of Uniloc 2017, LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hayes, Paul) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Uniloc 2017, LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Related Cases (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 23, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6865588.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc 2017, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/24/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc USA Inc et al v. ZTE (USA) Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA Inc
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Represented By: Edward R Nelson, III
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Anthony M Vecchione
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Represented By: Edward R Nelson, III
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Anthony M Vecchione
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc Licensing USA LLC
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Represented By: Edward R Nelson, III
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Anthony M Vecchione
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTE (USA) Inc
Represented By: Keana Theresa Taylor
Represented By: Jay Reiziss
Represented By: Charles M McMahon
Represented By: Calli Anne Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTE (TX) Inc
Represented By: Keana Theresa Taylor
Represented By: Jay Reiziss
Represented By: Charles M McMahon
Represented By: Calli Anne Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?