Kirk v. Pharmaceutical Products Development LC
Plaintiff: Ed Kirk, III
Defendant: Pharmaceutical Products Development, LC and Pharmaceutical Products Development LC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02850
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pharmaceutical Products Development LC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Pharmaceutical Products Development LLC for Pharmaceutical Products Development LC. (Kumpf, Tara)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint filed by Pharmaceutical Products Development LC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Kumpf, Tara) Modified Linkage & text on 12/14/2018 (svc).
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pharmaceutical Products Development LC filed by Ed Kirk, III. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order) (Boyd, Dan) Modified party on 12/14/2018 (axm).
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Pharmaceutical Products Development LC answer due 12/3/2018. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/21/2018) (epm)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Pharmaceutical Products Development LC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Tara Moriarty Kumpf added to party Pharmaceutical Products Development LC(pty:dft) (Kumpf, Tara)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ed Kirk, III. (Boyd, Dan)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pharmaceutical Products Development LC. (mcrd/ala)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ed Kirk, III filed by Ed Kirk, III. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9540742) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Boyd, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirk v. Pharmaceutical Products Development LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmaceutical Products Development, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmaceutical Products Development LC
Represented By: Tara Moriarty Kumpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Kirk, III
Represented By: Dan S Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?