Reef Mountain LLC v. Schneider Electric USA Inc
Plaintiff: Reef Mountain LLC
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc. and Schneider Electric USA Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02893
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Schneider Electric USA Inc answer due 1/28/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 11/19/2018) (axm)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Reef Mountain LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Orer) (Johnson, Jay)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Schneider Electric USA Inc; served on 11/7/2018. (Johnson, Jay)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Schneider Electric USA Inc. (epm)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Reef Mountain LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reef Mountain LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (zkc)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Schneider Electric USA, Inc. filed by Reef Mountain LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9552688) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reef Mountain LLC v. Schneider Electric USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reef Mountain LLC
Represented By: Jay B Johnson
Represented By: D Bradley Kizzia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?