Hanks v Sweet Georgia Brown BBQ & Home Cookin' Inc et al

Plaintiff: Katelyn Hanks
Defendant: Norman Pettis, Sweet Georgia Brown BBQ & Home Cookin' Inc and Norman Pettis Trustee
Case Number: 3:2018cv03009
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 10 NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendant Norman Pettis, Trustee without Prejudice filed by Katelyn Hanks (Schapiro, Douglas)
December 10, 2018 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sweet Georgia Brown BBQ & Home Cookin' Inc filed by Katelyn Hanks. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Schapiro, Douglas)
December 6, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sweet Georgia Brown BBQ & Home Cookin' Inc. (Uloth, Donald)
December 6, 2018 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Sweet Georgia Brown BBQ & Home Cookin' Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Donald E Uloth added to party Sweet Georgia Brown BBQ & Home Cookin' Inc(pty:dft) (Uloth, Donald)
November 15, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Norman Pettis Trustee; served on 11/13/2018. (Schapiro, Douglas)
November 15, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sweet Georgia Brown BBQ & Home Cookin' Inc; served on 11/13/2018. (Schapiro, Douglas)
November 9, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Norman Pettis, Trustee, Sweet Georgia Brown BBQ & Home Cookin' Inc. (ajb)
November 9, 2018 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
November 9, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Katelyn Hanks. (Schapiro, Douglas)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Norman Pettis, Trustee, Sweet Georgia Brown BBQ & Home Cookin', Inc. filed by Katelyn Hanks. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9575325) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Schapiro, Douglas) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened image on 11/9/2018) (ajb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanks v Sweet Georgia Brown BBQ & Home Cookin' Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelyn Hanks
Represented By: Douglas Schapiro
Represented By: Emil Lippe, Jr
Represented By: Douglas S Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Pettis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweet Georgia Brown BBQ & Home Cookin' Inc
Represented By: Donald E Uloth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Pettis Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?