Barton v. North American Van Lines Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Benny Barton
Defendant: Burgess North American Palm Springs Corporation, North American Van Lines Inc, All Points Investments Inc and Burgess North American
Case Number: 3:2018cv03074
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Commerce
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Unopposed Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. Defendants may proceed in this case without the designation of local counsel. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/10/2019) (ewd)
January 9, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION To Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Burgess North American, North American Van Lines Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order) (Fulkerson, Daniel)
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Status Conference held on 1/7/2019. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Blake Brownshadel; Defense - Ryan Hand. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :25. (chmb)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #4 Motion to Dismiss in light of the filing of the Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/7/2019) (chmb)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Dismissal with Prejudice against All Points Investments, Inc. filed by Benny Barton (Sheehan, Connor)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION filed by Benny Barton re: #11 Second MOTION to Dismiss (Sheehan, Connor)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by North American Van Lines Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order) (Hand, Ryan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Benny Barton. (Sheehan, Connor)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by Benny Barton re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) (Sheehan, Connor)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Benny Barton. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sheehan, Connor)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/12/2018) (epm)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ***Please Disregard- corrected order entered as No. #7 *** ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The Court hereby sets this case for a scheduling conference hearing on 1/7/2019 at 9:30 a.m. at the United States District Court, 1100 Commerce Street, Courtroom 1632, Dallas, Texas 75242. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/12/2018) (aaa) Modified on 12/13/2018 (epm).
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Removal filed by North American Van Lines Inc (Hand, Ryan)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Burgess North American Palm Springs Corporation, North American Van Lines Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Proposed Order)Attorney Ryan Thomas Hand added to party North American Van Lines Inc(pty:dft) (Hand, Ryan)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Burgess North American Palm Springs Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Banning Van & Storage, Inc. for Burgess North American Palm Springs Corporation. (Hand, Ryan)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 193rd District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-18-16465 filed by Burgess North American Palm Springs Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9594260) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Cover Sheet, #12 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Hand, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barton v. North American Van Lines Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgess North American Palm Springs Corporation
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Hand
Represented By: Daniel L Fulkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Van Lines Inc
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Hand
Represented By: Daniel L Fulkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Points Investments Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgess North American
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Hand
Represented By: Daniel L Fulkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Barton
Represented By: Blake Jordan Brownshadel
Represented By: Connor Gordan Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?