Foreign Trade Zone Operating Company of Texas v. AZIMC Investments Inc et al
Plaintiff: Foreign Trade Zone Operating Company of Texas
Defendant: AZIMC Investments Inc and AutoZone Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv03174
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 3/18/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2019. Discovery due by 8/16/2019. Initial Mediation due by 3/31/2019. Mediation of this case due by 9/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/17/2019) (mcrd)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Bench Trial set for 1/9/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. Pretrial Materials due by 12/20/2019. Pretrial Order due by 12/20/2019. Trial related Motions due by 12/13/2019. Responses due by 12/20/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/17/2019) (mcrd)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY AND OTHER NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/17/2019) (mcrd)
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Horan: Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 1/17/2019. Order to enter. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kent C Krause; Defense - Matthew W Ray, John S Golwen (via telephone). (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :05. (mcrd)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER: On January 17, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., the Court will conduct a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) pretrial scheduling conference. Plaintiff's counsel and Defendants' local counsel must attend in person, and Defendants' other counsel may participate by telephone. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/4/2019.)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC CONSENT to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by all parties and Order Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/28/2018) (chmb)
December 27, 2018 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT and Agreed Proposed Discovery Plan Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(f) filed by Foreign Trade Zone Operating Company of Texas. (Krause, Kent)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan E. Nelson. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/13/2018) (chmb)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of John S. Golwen. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/13/2018) (chmb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Foreign Trade Zone Operating Company of Texas. (Krause, Kent)
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 (Document Restricted) Sealed Attorney Contact Info (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Foreign Trade Zone Operating Company of Texas (Krause, Kent)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 (Document Restricted) Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by AZIMC Investments Inc, AutoZone Inc (Ray, Matthew)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jonathan E. Nelson (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9627596) filed by AZIMC Investments Inc, AutoZone Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Jonathan E. Nelson) (Ray, Matthew)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney John S. Golwen (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9627284) filed by AZIMC Investments Inc, AutoZone Inc (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - John S. Golwen) (Ray, Matthew)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by AZIMC Investments Inc, AutoZone Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ray, Matthew)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 (Document Restricted) Sealed Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by AZIMC Investments Inc, AutoZone Inc (Ray, Matthew)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report, which shall be filed no later than 10 days from the date of the scheduling conference. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/30/2018) (axm)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AZIMC Investments Inc, AutoZone Inc. (Ray, Matthew)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 44th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-18-16831 filed by AZIMC Investments Inc, AutoZone Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9616073) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Ray, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foreign Trade Zone Operating Company of Texas v. AZIMC Investments Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AZIMC Investments Inc
Represented By: Matthew W Ray
Represented By: Jonathan E Nelson
Represented By: John S Golwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Inc
Represented By: Matthew W Ray
Represented By: Jonathan E Nelson
Represented By: John S Golwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foreign Trade Zone Operating Company of Texas
Represented By: Malerie T Anderson
Represented By: Kent C Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?