Guandarrama v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bernardo Guandarrama
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv03201
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER WITHDRAWING AND SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL granting #10 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/27/2018) (ykp)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BP Exploration & Production Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate BP p.l.c. for BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Taylor, Thomas)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BP America Production Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate BP p.l.c. for BP America Production Company. (Taylor, Thomas)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Kevin M. Hodges, Catherine McEldowney, and Don K. Haycraft added attorney Thomas Wilson Taylor,Thomas Wilson Taylor,Joseph Blizzard,Connell Chad Hess,Georgia Lee Lucier for BP America Production Company,Thomas Wilson Taylor,Joseph Blizzard,Connell Chad Hess,Georgia Lee Lucier for BP Exploration & Production Inc. Motion filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Thomas Wilson Taylor added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Wilson Taylor added to party BP Exploration & Production Inc(pty:dft) (Taylor, Thomas)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Order to show cause in writing why the Court should not dismiss the case for want to jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/10/2018) (zkc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 Case electronically transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-07324. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Texas: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 12/4/2018.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2018.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7039499) filed by Bernardo Guandarrama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party Bernardo Guandarrama(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guandarrama v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernardo Guandarrama
Represented By: Craig Downs
Represented By: Vanessa Elizabeth Diaz
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Connell Chad Hess
Represented By: Thomas Wilson Taylor
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Joseph Blizzard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Connell Chad Hess
Represented By: Thomas Wilson Taylor
Represented By: Georgia Lee Lucier
Represented By: Joseph Blizzard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?