US Bank NA v. Raasch
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee and US Bank NA
Defendant: Berneice A. Raasch
Case Number: 3:2018cv03223
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Berneice A. Raasch ; served on 1/16/2019. (svc)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Substituted Service of Process on Defendant Berneice A. Raasch. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/15/2019) (zkc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Substituted Service of Process filed by US Bank NA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Cronenwett, Mark)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Berneice A. Raasch. (mla)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by US Bank NA. (Cronenwett, Mark)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Berneice A. Raasch filed by US Bank NA. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9629344) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Bank NA v. Raasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank NA
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Represented By: Gordon Welborne Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berneice A. Raasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?