Angels of Care Home Health Inc v. Azar, II
Plaintiff: Angels of Care Home Health, Inc. and Angels of Care Home Health Inc
Defendant: Secretary Alex M Azar, II and Alex M Azar, II
Case Number: 3:2018cv03268
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Calvin Trey Scott on behalf of Angels of Care Home Health Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Scott, Calvin)
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Answer Deadline filed by Alex M Azar, II with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #3 is set for hearing on 2/13/2019 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1632, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/28/2019) (chmb)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY filed by Angels of Care Home Health Inc re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Kennedy, Mark)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alex M Azar, II. (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 Appendix in Support filed by Alex M Azar, II re #10 Response/Objection (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Alex M Azar, II re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ on behalf of Alex M Azar, II. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Delaney-DOJ, Sarah)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Alex M Azar, II ; served on 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Kennedy, Mark)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Alex M Azar, II, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (zkc)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Angels of Care Home Health Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s)) (Kennedy, Mark) Modified docket text on 12/14/2018 (zkc).
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Angels of Care Home Health, Inc. re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s)) (Kennedy, Mark)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Angels of Care Home Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kennedy, Mark)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Angels of Care Home Health, Inc.. (Kennedy, Mark)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M Azar, II filed by Angels of Care Home Health Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9642654) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Kennedy, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angels of Care Home Health Inc v. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angels of Care Home Health, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angels of Care Home Health Inc
Represented By: Calvin Trey Scott
Represented By: Mark S Kennedy
Represented By: Joanna H. Martin
Represented By: Nicole Rae Ward
Represented By: Lurese A Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?