Coleman v. FEMA

Plaintiff: Nina Marie Coleman
Defendant: FEMA
Case Number: 3:2018cv03408
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the plaintiff's #15 Motion to Amend Document 12 Summons in Civil Action. The plaintiff may not file any additional attachments to the complaint without prior Court approval. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 1/18/2019) (mcrd)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Summons Issued, #11 Order, amend docket 12 filed by Nina Marie Coleman (Coleman, Nina) Modified docket text on 1/18/2019 (zkc).
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re #9 Additional Attachments to Main Document, #10 Additional Attachments to Main Document, #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #3 Complaint, #7 Judge's Questionnaire, #12 Summons Issued, #11 Order, #8 Response/Objection. Signed on 1/16/2019. (rekc)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ***DISREGARD - ENTERED IN WRONG CASE*** ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 1/15/2019) (rekc) Modified on 1/15/2019 (rekc).
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 Summons issued as to FEMA, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (rekc)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons for each named defendant and deliver the summons, a copy of the complaint and the plaintiff's answers and supplemental answers to the Court's questionnaire to the United States Marshal's Service. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 1/15/2019) (rekc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #8 Answer to Judge's Questionnaire Answer to #6 by Plaintiff Nina Marie Coleman. Filed using the Emergency Filing Procedures. (cea)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #8 Answer to Judge's Questionnaire by Plaintiff Nina Marie Coleman. Filed using the Emergency Filing Procedures. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (cea)
January 13, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to Judge's Questionnaire filed by Nina Marie Coleman re: #7 Judge's Questionnaire. Filed using the Emergency Filing Procedures. (cea)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Judge's Questionnaire sent to Nina Marie Coleman. Deadline to respond to the questionnaire is 14 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 12/31/2018) (zkc)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Service of process shall be withheld pending completion of judicial screening as provided by 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 12/31/2018) (zkc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nina Marie Coleman. (mla)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nina Marie Coleman. (mla)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against FEMA filed by Nina Marie Coleman. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mla)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mla)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. FEMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Marie Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?