Hobbs v. Warren et al

Plaintiff: Tony Hobbs
Defendant: City of Mesquite, Kyle Warren and City of Garland
Case Number: 3:2019cv00047
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Tony Hobbs re #20 Response/Objection to Defendant City of Garland's Motion Dismiss (Palmer, Scott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Tony Hobbs re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process (Palmer, Scott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Garland; served on 3/2/2019. (mla)
February 28, 2019 Filing 18 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Tony Hobbs re #17 Response/Objection to Defendant City of Mesquite's Motion Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Palmer, Scott)
February 28, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Tony Hobbs re: #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Palmer, Scott)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: the #12 City of Garland's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(5). Respondent may file a response by 3/8/2019. Movant may file a reply by 3/22/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/19/2019) (mcrd)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERENCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), City of Garland's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(5) (Doc. #12 ), filed February 15, 2019, is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for hearing, if necessary, and for the United States Magistrate Judge to submit to the court proposed findings and recommendations for disposition of the motion. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/19/2019) (aaa)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Reissued as to City of Garland. (zkc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Tony Hobbs. (Palmer, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Insufficient Service of Process filed by City of Garland with Brief/Memorandum in Support.. Party City of Garland added.Attorney Kurt C Banowsky added to party City of Garland(pty:dft) (Banowsky, Kurt)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Garland ; served on 1/25/2019. (Palmer, Scott)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Mesquite ; served on 1/18/2019. (Palmer, Scott)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by City of Mesquite. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Tooley, Joe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by City of Mesquite. (Tooley, Joe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Mesquite. (Tooley, Joe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by City of Mesquite re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Tooley, Joe)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Mesquite Attorney Joe C Tooley added to party City of Mesquite(pty:dft) (Tooley, Joe)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Garland, City of Mesquite, Kyle Warren. (epm)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tony Hobbs. (Roberts, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Tony Hobbs. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9688974) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Roberts, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobbs v. Warren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mesquite
Represented By: Joe C Tooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Garland
Represented By: Kurt C Banowsky
Represented By: Michael John Betz
Represented By: Ronald Bradford Neighbor
Represented By: Christopher D Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Hobbs
Represented By: Scott H Palmer
Represented By: James Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?