Aubrey et al v. D Magazine Partners LP et al

Plaintiff: Steven B Aubrey and Brian E Vodicka
Defendant: Scott Robert Sayers, Does 1-20, City of Dallas, Jamie L Thompson, Dallas County Texas, Robert L Ermatinger, Jr, Eric Vaughn Moye, Allison Media Inc and D Magazine Partners LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00056
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Robert L Ermatinger, Jr. (ndt)
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Steven B Aubrey. (Aubrey, Steven)
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Robert L Ermatinger, Jr. (Aubrey, Steven)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Scott Robert Sayers. Waiver sent on 2/5/2019. (Aubrey, Steven)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to City of Dallas. Waiver sent on 2/5/2019. (Aubrey, Steven)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Eric Vaughn Moye. Waiver sent on 2/5/2019. (Aubrey, Steven) Modified waiver sent date on 2/21/2019 (zkc).
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dallas County Texas. Waiver sent on 2/5/2019. (Aubrey, Steven) Modified waiver sent date on 2/21/2019 (zkc).
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jamie L Thompson. Waiver sent on 2/5/2019. (Aubrey, Steven) Modified waiver sent date on 2/21/2019 (zkc).
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to D Magazine Partners LP. Waiver sent on 2/5/2019. (Aubrey, Steven) Modified waiver sent date on 2/21/2019 (zkc).
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Allison Media Inc. Waiver sent on 2/5/2019. (Aubrey, Steven) Modified waiver sent date on 2/21/2019 (zkc).
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Steven B Aubrey. (Aubrey, Steven)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND, by Plaintiff Steven B Aubrey. (Aubrey, Steven) Modified relationships and docket text on 1/10/2019 (ajb).
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Correction re: #3 Complaint filed by Steven B Aubrey (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 pgs 11-41 corrected, #3 pgs 42-82 corrected, #4 pgs 83-99 corrected) (Aubrey, Steven)
January 8, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Tue Jan 8 15:48:12 CST 2019 (crt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Allison Media Inc, City of Dallas, D Magazine Partners LP, Dallas County Texas, Does 1-20, Robert L Ermatinger, Jr, Eric Vaughn Moye, Scott Robert Sayers, Jamie L Thompson filed by Brian E Vodicka, Steven B Aubrey. (Filing fee $400.00; Receipt number 113235) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mla)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mla)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aubrey et al v. D Magazine Partners LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Robert Sayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie L Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Ermatinger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Vaughn Moye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Media Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Magazine Partners LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven B Aubrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian E Vodicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?