Rawlings et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Stanford, Daniel Walker, Sandra Rivero, Jonathan Schumann, Nicholas Vanarsdale, Roy Shaw, Theodore Springer, Paul Westphal, Roy Witten, Tyrone Syehla, Alicia Venzor, James Watson, Perla Watson, Eddie Henry, Richard Earl Tyler, Sean Serraguard, Clinten Waybourn, Jeff Thomas, Jeff Cole, Lori Sneddon, Xavier Villarreal, Bradley Sellers, Carl Wilburn, Tom Rogers, Bruce Smith, Bill Snedden, Joseph Reilly, Renee Smith, Arnold Patrick, Daniel Comer, Matthew Sargent, Ronald Sims, Timothy Wright, Teresa Vargas, Richard Smith, Donnie Warrick, Michael David Roberts, Dan Walker, James Jim Smith, Terry Sisson, Yvette Rodriguez, Lauren Walser, Danielle Watson, Robert Rutter, Michael Sneed, John Rowland, Daniel White, Rito Tiscareno, Charles Beatty, Luis Roacho, Robert E. Will, Nina Toole-Randall, Dan Stroup, Dannie Ringer, Jason Short, Alfredo Topete, Charles Doug Townsend, Robert Weston, Alfred Woodruff, Jeff Wallace, Don Smith, Adrian Rivero, Regina Sanchez, Thomas Rawlings, Stephen Vincent, Ruben Vaz, Juan Carlos Rodriguez, Jason Sanchez, Humberto Yzaguirre, Joe Richardson, Jimmy Taylor, Victor Zuniga, Reynaldo Sias, Paul Shamburger, Teresa Williams, Eric Wade, Armando Torres, Tonya McCutcheon, Juan Sendejo, Hank Secord, Brent Sigler, Juan Fuentes, Carroll Weathers, Rowdy Slaughter, Veryl Sullivan, Margaret F. White, Kyle Roesler, David Rodriguez, Leslie Earle Stubbs, Robert Red-Owl, Jose Vargas, Dennis Wiggins, Norris Gabriel Schexnider, Jr, Anthony Strouth, Gregory Ruehlen, David Stacy, Sheryl Roppolo, Phillip Taylor, Michael R. Reed, Ferral Vidrine, Jeremy Vaughan, Steve Weckworth, Angela Sisson, Kyle Reeves, Gerald Wilfong, Kenneth Thompson, Tia Short, Jaime Sotelo, Clayton Stewart, Greg Womack and Billy Williams
Defendant: VM Motori SpA, VM North America Inc, Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles NV and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00070
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in California Northern District as case number 3:19-cv-452. (epm)
January 24, 2019 Interdistrict Transfer to Northern District of California; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Northern District of California. (mla)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 14): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 277, and that order has now been filed in the Northern District of California. (mla)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Errata re: #1 Complaint filed by Charles Beatty, Jeff Cole, Daniel Comer, Juan Fuentes, Eddie Henry, Tonya McCutcheon, Arnold Patrick, Thomas Rawlings, Robert Red-Owl, Michael R. Reed, Kyle Reeves, Joseph Reilly, Joe Richardson, Dannie Ringer, Adrian Rivero, Sandra Rivero, Luis Roacho, Michael David Roberts, David Rodriguez, Juan Carlos Rodriguez, Yvette Rodriguez, Kyle Roesler, Tom Rogers, Sheryl Roppolo, John Rowland, Gregory Ruehlen, Robert Rutter, Jason Sanchez, Regina Sanchez, Matthew Sargent, Norris Gabriel Schexnider, Jr, Jonathan Schumann, Hank Secord, Bradley Sellers, Juan Sendejo, Sean Serraguard, Paul Shamburger, Roy Shaw, Jason Short, Tia Short, Reynaldo Sias, Brent Sigler, Ronald Sims, Angela Sisson, Terry Sisson, Rowdy Slaughter, Bruce Smith, Don Smith, James Jim Smith, Renee Smith, Richard Smith, Bill Snedden, Lori Sneddon, Michael Sneed, Jaime Sotelo, Theodore Springer, David Stacy, John Stanford, Clayton Stewart, Dan Stroup, Anthony Strouth, Leslie Earle Stubbs, Veryl Sullivan, Tyrone Syehla, Jimmy Taylor, Phillip Taylor, Jeff Thomas, Kenneth Thompson, Rito Tiscareno, Nina Toole-Randall, Alfredo Topete, Armando Torres, Charles Doug Townsend, Richard Earl Tyler, Nicholas Vanarsdale, Jose Vargas, Teresa Vargas, Jeremy Vaughan, Ruben Vaz, Alicia Venzor, Ferral Vidrine, Xavier Villarreal, Stephen Vincent, Eric Wade, Dan Walker, Daniel Walker, Jeff Wallace, Lauren Walser, Donnie Warrick, Danielle Watson, James Watson, Perla Watson, Clinten Waybourn, Carroll Weathers, Steve Weckworth, Robert Weston, Paul Westphal, Daniel White, Margaret F. White, Dennis Wiggins, Carl Wilburn, Gerald Wilfong, Robert E. Will, Billy Williams, Teresa Williams, Roy Witten, Greg Womack, Alfred Woodruff, Timothy Wright, Humberto Yzaguirre, Victor Zuniga (Pearson, Eric)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rekc) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/9/2019) (rekc).
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Charles Beatty, Jeff Cole, Daniel Comer, Juan Fuentes, Eddie Henry, Tonya McCutcheon, Arnold Patrick, Thomas Rawlings, Robert Red-Owl, Michael R. Reed, Kyle Reeves, Joseph Reilly, Joe Richardson, Dannie Ringer, Adrian Rivero, Sandra Rivero, Luis Roacho, Michael David Roberts, David Rodriguez, Juan Carlos Rodriguez, Yvette Rodriguez, Kyle Roesler, Tom Rogers, Sheryl Roppolo, John Rowland, Gregory Ruehlen, Robert Rutter, Jason Sanchez, Regina Sanchez, Matthew Sargent, Norris Gabriel Schexnider, Jr., Jonathan Schumann, Hank Secord, Bradley Sellers, Juan Sendejo, Sean Serraguard, Paul Shamburger, Roy Shaw, Jason Short, Tia Short, Reynaldo Sias, Brent Sigler, Ronald Sims, Angela Sisson, Terry Sisson, Rowdy Slaughter, Bruce Smith, Don Smith, James Jim Smith, Renee Smith, Richard Smith, Bill Snedden, Lori Sneddon, Michael Sneed, Jaime Sotelo, Theodore Springer, David Stacy, John Stanford, Clayton Stewart, Dan Stroup, Anthony Strouth, Leslie Earle Stubbs, Veryl Sullivan, Tyrone Syehla, Jimmy Taylor, Phillip Taylor, Jeff Thomas, Kenneth Thompson, Rito Tiscareno, Nina Toole-Randall, Alfredo Topete, Armando Torres, Charles Doug Townsend, Richard Earl Tyler, Nicholas Vanarsdale, Jose Vargas, Teresa Vargas, Jeremy Vaughan, Ruben Vaz, Alicia Venzor, Ferral Vidrine, Xavier Villarreal, Stephen Vincent, Eric Wade, Dan Walker, Daniel Walker, Jeff Wallace, Lauren Walser, Donnie Warrick, Danielle Watson, James Watson, Perla Watson, Clinten Waybourn, Carroll Weathers, Steve Weckworth, Robert Weston, Paul Westphal, Daniel White, Margaret F. White, Dennis Wiggins, Carl Wilburn, Gerald Wilfong, Robert E. Will, Billy Williams, Teresa Williams, Roy Witten, Greg Womack, Alfred Woodruff, Timothy Wright, Humberto Yzaguirre, Victor Zuniga. (Pearson, Eric)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Tia Short, Jason Short, Daniel White, Rito Tiscareno, Jason Sanchez, Teresa Vargas, Humberto Yzaguirre, Dannie Ringer, Jeff Wallace, Hank Secord, Greg Womack, John Rowland, Jeremy Vaughan, Tom Rogers, Richard Smith, Leslie Earle Stubbs, James Watson, Alicia Venzor, Bradley Sellers, Robert E. Will, Tyrone Syehla, Jeff Thomas, Ferral Vidrine, Robert Rutter, Dennis Wiggins, Daniel Comer, Victor Zuniga, Robert Weston, Luis Roacho, Roy Shaw, Brent Sigler, Michael David Roberts, Margaret F. White, Dan Walker, Jaime Sotelo, Eddie Henry, Carroll Weathers, Carl Wilburn, Eric Wade, Jeff Cole, Alfredo Topete, Sean Serraguard, David Stacy, Rowdy Slaughter, Nina Toole-Randall, Teresa Williams, Renee Smith, Tonya McCutcheon, David Rodriguez, Kyle Roesler, Lauren Walser, Clayton Stewart, Phillip Taylor, Veryl Sullivan, Timothy Wright, Ruben Vaz, Armando Torres, Lori Sneddon, Clinten Waybourn, Stephen Vincent, Gregory Ruehlen, Kenneth Thompson, Anthony Strouth, Charles Doug Townsend, Jose Vargas, Richard Earl Tyler, Robert Red-Owl, Sheryl Roppolo, Thomas Rawlings, Steve Weckworth, Paul Shamburger, Alfred Woodruff, Donnie Warrick, Juan Fuentes, Jonathan Schumann, Juan Sendejo, Danielle Watson, Xavier Villarreal, Bruce Smith, Yvette Rodriguez, Nicholas Vanarsdale, Jimmy Taylor, Theodore Springer, Norris Gabriel Schexnider, Jr., Arnold Patrick, Dan Stroup, Daniel Walker, Regina Sanchez, Don Smith, Bill Snedden, Matthew Sargent, Juan Carlos Rodriguez, Billy Williams, Charles Beatty, Joe Richardson, Perla Watson, Michael R. Reed, Ronald Sims, Gerald Wilfong, Paul Westphal, Adrian Rivero, John Stanford, Michael Sneed, Sandra Rivero, Angela Sisson, Roy Witten, Kyle Reeves, Reynaldo Sias, Terry Sisson, James Jim Smith, Joseph Reilly. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0539-9695439) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Pearson, Eric) (Attachment 1 replaced with flattened image on 1/9/2019) (rekc). Modified to add filing fee info on 1/9/2019 (rekc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawlings et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stanford
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Walker
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Rivero
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Schumann
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Vanarsdale
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Shaw
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Springer
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Westphal
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Witten
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Syehla
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Venzor
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Watson
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perla Watson
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Henry
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Earl Tyler
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Serraguard
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinten Waybourn
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Thomas
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Cole
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Sneddon
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Villarreal
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Sellers
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Wilburn
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Rogers
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Smith
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Snedden
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Reilly
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Smith
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Patrick
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Comer
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Sargent
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Sims
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Wright
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Vargas
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Smith
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Warrick
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael David Roberts
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Walker
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jim Smith
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Sisson
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Rodriguez
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Walser
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Watson
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rutter
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sneed
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rowland
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel White
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rito Tiscareno
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Beatty
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Roacho
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Will
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Toole-Randall
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Stroup
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dannie Ringer
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Short
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Topete
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Doug Townsend
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Weston
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Woodruff
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Wallace
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Smith
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Rivero
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Sanchez
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Rawlings
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Vincent
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Vaz
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Rodriguez
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Sanchez
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humberto Yzaguirre
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Richardson
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Taylor
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Zuniga
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Sias
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Shamburger
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Williams
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Wade
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Torres
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya McCutcheon
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Sendejo
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hank Secord
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Sigler
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Fuentes
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carroll Weathers
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowdy Slaughter
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veryl Sullivan
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret F. White
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Roesler
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rodriguez
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Earle Stubbs
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Red-Owl
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Vargas
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Wiggins
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norris Gabriel Schexnider, Jr
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Strouth
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Ruehlen
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stacy
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Roppolo
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Taylor
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Reed
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferral Vidrine
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Vaughan
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Weckworth
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Sisson
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Reeves
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Wilfong
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Thompson
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tia Short
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Sotelo
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Stewart
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Womack
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Williams
Represented By: Eric Donovan Pearson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Michael E Heygood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VM Motori SpA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VM North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiat Chrysler Automobiles NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?