Herndon v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Dawn Herndon
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00086
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Mail returned as undeliverable. #7 Order Transferring to Another Division, #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis received back from Dawn Herndon as Return to Sender Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (ndt)
February 15, 2019 Case copied to 4:19cv0148-Y. Transfer to Fort Worth Division complete; clerk to set Related Case hyperlink, clear unnecessary flags, etc. (ldm)
February 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Fri Feb 15 17:15:13 CST 2019 (crt)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER: Plaintiff's complaint is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/15/2019) (aaa)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE AND INSTRUCTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/15/2019) (aaa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Dawn Herndon. (mla)
January 11, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Jan 11 12:49:05 CST 2019 (crt)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Dawn Herndon must address the following deficiency: pay the $400 filing fee or submit an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with the required Certificate of Inmate Trust Account. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 1/11/2019) (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (mla)
January 10, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Thu Jan 10 14:06:27 CST 2019 (crt)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against United States of America filed by Dawn Herndon. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ala)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ala)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ala)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herndon v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Herndon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?