Tamborello v. Bankers Standard Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Sam C Tamborello
Defendant: Scott A Dudley, Bankers Standard Insurance Company and Cathy McNeil
Case Number: 3:2019cv00092
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
0 Judge: Jane J Boyle
1 Judge: David L Horan
2 Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per #13 Stipulation of Dismissal. (epm)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Scott A Dudley, Cathy McNeil. (Moody, James)
January 25, 2019 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan per to Special Order 3. (axm)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Jane J. Boyle recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-CV-0092-M. (axm)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES: Based on the current filings, this Court appears to indeed have jurisdiction, as the parties are alleged to be diverse and Plaintiff specifically requests that "[t]he maximum Personal Injury Protection policy insurance limits of $100,000" be awarded to him, among other relief. However, if additional information not currently before the Court would alter this analysis, Plaintiff should present that information in a timely Motion to Remand. If Plaintiff wishes to file a Motion to Remand on the basis of any defect other than lack of subject matter jurisdiction, he must do so by 2/11/2019. Responses due by 2/7/2019 re: #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 1/23/2019) (axm)
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Letter to Honorable Jane Boyle filed by Sam C Tamborello (Tamborello, Sam)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Scott A Dudley, Cathy McNeil re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Schout, Marcie)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY filed by Sam C Tamborello re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Tamborello, Sam)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Appendix in Support filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Scott A Dudley, Cathy McNeil re #6 Appendix in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) App. 001 - 080) (Schout, Marcie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Brief in Support filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Scott A Dudley, Cathy McNeil re #5 MOTION to Dismiss. (Schout, Marcie) Modified text to reflect title of document on 1/17/2019 (dsr).
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Scott A Dudley, Cathy McNeil (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Motion to Dismiss) (Schout, Marcie)
January 11, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4. Fri Jan 11 10:54:19 CST 2019 (crt)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ajb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Scott A. Dudley, Cathy McNeil identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Chubb Limited for Bankers Standard Insurance Company. (Schout, Marcie)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 134th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, case number DC-18-18625 filed by Cathy McNeil, Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Scott A. Dudley. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9700662) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Moody, James).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tamborello v. Bankers Standard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A Dudley
Represented By: Marcie L Schout
Represented By: James H Moody, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Marcie L Schout
Represented By: James H Moody, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy McNeil
Represented By: Marcie L Schout
Represented By: James H Moody, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam C Tamborello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?