Ford v. ALDI (Texas) LLC

Plaintiff: Alice Ford
Defendant: ALDI (Texas) LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00121
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Discovery filed by ALDI (Texas) LLC (Sargent, David)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/16/2020 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 7/8/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2019. Motions due by 12/13/2019. Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/4/2019. Pretrial Order due by 3/2/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 3/2/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/4/2019) (axm)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by ALDI (Texas) LLC. (Sargent, David)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 3/4/2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/11/2019) (zkc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS filed by Alice Ford (Kraatz, Kennedy) Modified text on 1/24/2019 (dsr).
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALDI (Texas) LLC. (Sargent, David)
January 15, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by ALDI (Texas) LLC (see document attachment #3 -1 for image). (zkc)
January 15, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ALDI (Texas) LLC (see document attachment #1 -6 for image). (zkc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by ALDI (Texas) LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Original Answer) (Sargent, David)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 3, case number CC-18-06887-C filed by ALDI (Texas) LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9710047) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit(s) Index of State Court file, #3 Exhibit(s) State Court File, #4 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit(s) COIP, #7 Exhibit(s) Disclosures) (Sargent, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. ALDI (Texas) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALDI (Texas) LLC
Represented By: Steven W Hopkins
Represented By: David L Sargent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Ford
Represented By: Kennedy Gill Kraatz
Represented By: David E Williams, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?