Lott v. Oseguera et al
Plaintiff: Rheashad Lamar Lott
Defendant: John Brimmer and E Oseguera
Case Number: 3:2019cv00126
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. T.O. forms mailed out with NOA. Wed Mar 13 13:24:41 CDT 2019 (crt)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #8 Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #9 Judgment, to the Fifth Circuit by Rheashad Lamar Lott. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (aaa)
February 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8, 9. Mon Feb 25 10:18:32 CST 2019 (crt)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT: The plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b). This dismissal will count as a strike or prior occasion within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/22/2019) (rekc)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Accepting #6 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/22/2019) (rekc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 Findings and Recommendations. (ndt)
January 30, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Jan 30 08:51:13 CST 2019 (crt)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation: Plaintiff's complaint should be dismissed with prejudice as frivolous and for failure to state a cause of action under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b). Such dismissal will count as a "strike" or "prior occasion" within the meaning 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 1/30/2019) (mcrd)
January 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu Jan 17 11:14:34 CST 2019 (crt)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 1/17/2019) (mla)
January 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Jan 16 16:52:23 CST 2019 (crt)
January 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Wed Jan 16 16:17:43 CST 2019 (crt)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Rheashad Lamar Lott. (epm)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against John Brimmer, E Oseguera filed by Rheashad Lamar Lott. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (epm)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (epm)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lott v. Oseguera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rheashad Lamar Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Oseguera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?