Joiner v. Rosemonts at Mission Trails et al
Plaintiff: Lakysha Joiner
Defendant: Tisha Johnson, Cynthia Prince, Rosemonts at Mission Trails and Paul Beckingham
Case Number: 3:2019cv00142
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Mon Feb 25 11:46:42 CST 2019 (crt)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION on Case re: #1 Complaint, filed by Lakysha Joiner. The Court should dismiss this action without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(h)(3). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/25/2019) (epm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Establish Subject-Matter Jurisdiction filed by Lakysha Joiner. (zkc)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend and Add Addresses of Defendants filed by Lakysha Joiner. (rekc)
January 22, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue Jan 22 14:07:32 CST 2019 (crt)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION: Response due by 2/21/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/22/2019) (rekc)
January 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,4. Fri Jan 18 08:43:29 CST 2019 (crt)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (svc)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lakysha Joiner (svc)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Beckingham, Tisha Johnson, Cynthia Prince, Rosemonts at Mission Trails filed by Lakysha Joiner. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (svc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joiner v. Rosemonts at Mission Trails et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tisha Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemonts at Mission Trails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Beckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakysha Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?