401 Palace Parkway LP v. Education Affiliates Inc
Plaintiff: 401 Palace Parkway LP
Defendant: Education Affiliates Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00151
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ESTABLISHING SCHEDULE AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL REQUIREMENTS: This case is set for trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 5/4/2020 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2019. Motions due by 10/25/2019. Discovery due by 12/31/2019. Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 4/24/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2020 10:00 AM before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/18/2019) (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (zkc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by 401 Palace Parkway LP. Related document: #10 Answer to Complaint Counterclaim (Hellberg, Jeffrey).
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by 401 Palace Parkway LP. (Hellberg, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ollie Ancil Cleveland, III. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/26/2019) (zkc)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9800308) filed by Education Affiliates Inc Attorney Ollie Ancil Cleveland, III added to party Education Affiliates Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Ollie Ancil Cleveland, III added to party Education Affiliates Inc(pty:cc) (Cleveland, Ollie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 Amended ANSWER to Complaint filed by Education Affiliates Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against 401 Palace Parkway LP filed by Education Affiliates Inc (Jackson, Stephen)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/13/2019) (zkc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey M Tillotson on behalf of Education Affiliates Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Tillotson, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 401 Palace Parkway LP. (Hellberg, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Education Affiliates Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Jackson, Stephen)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: within 20 days of this date, the defendant shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so will result in dismissal without prejudice of this case without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/24/2019) (zkc)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/23/2019) (zkc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Education Affiliates, Inc. (Jackson, Stephen)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 101st Civil District Court of Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-18-18155 filed by Education Affiliates, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9718659) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Tres Cleveland, #2 Declaration(s) of Stephen J. Budosh, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Jackson, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 401 Palace Parkway LP v. Education Affiliates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Education Affiliates Inc
Represented By: Stephen Clark Jackson
Represented By: Jeffrey M Tillotson
Represented By: Ollie Ancil Cleveland, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 401 Palace Parkway LP
Represented By: Austin Nash Priddy
Represented By: Jeffrey W Hellberg, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?