Portus Singapore Pte Ltd et al v. Vivint Inc
Plaintiff: Portus Singapore Pte Ltd., Portus Pty Ltd., Portus Singapore Pte Ltd and Portus Pty Ltd
Defendant: Vivint, Inc. and Vivint Inc
Special Master: Special Master
Not Yet Classified: ADR Provider
Case Number: 3:2019cv00310
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Portus Pty Ltd, Portus Singapore Pte Ltd. Related document: #35 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. (Moore, Stevenson)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Agreed Protective Order. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/21/2019) (rekc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Portus Pty Ltd, Portus Singapore Pte Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B) (Moore, Stevenson)
August 12, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Vivint Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Vivint Inc (Klein, Eric) Modified on 8/13/2019 (aaa).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (Document Restricted) Sealed Order re #33 Special Master's Certification of Hours and Costs. The Court hereby APPROVES the fees and expenses incurred between 6/1/2019 and 7/31/2019 by Daniel Denton as Special Master in this case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/8/2019) (aaa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 33 (Document Restricted) Special Master's Certification of Hours and Costs (Sealed pursuant to order dated 5/31/2019) filed by Special Master (Denton, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 32 Designation of Mediator by Portus Pty Ltd, Portus Singapore Pte Ltd. (Moore, Stevenson)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying #23 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/29/2019) (zkc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY filed by Vivint Inc re: #23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Klein, Eric)
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Portus Pty Ltd, Portus Singapore Pte Ltd re #27 Response/Objection (Moore, Stevenson)
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE filed by Portus Pty Ltd, Portus Singapore Pte Ltd re: #23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Moore, Stevenson)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/5/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Ed Kinkeade. Deadline for mediation is on or before 10/4/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/8/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2019. Discovery due by 9/15/2020. Motions due by 10/30/2020. Pretrial Order due by 3/15/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 3/15/2021. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/21/2019) (chmb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean P Belding on behalf of Vivint Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Belding, Sean)
June 12, 2019 Filing 24 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Vivint Inc re #23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Klein, Eric)
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Vivint Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klein, Eric)
June 7, 2019 Filing 22 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Portus Pty Ltd, Portus Singapore Pte Ltd. (Wang, Timothy)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER APPOINTING Special Master. The Court hereby appoints Daniel Denton as Special Master for this proceeding to perform the duties of an adjunct law clerk and technical advisor. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/31/2019) (ykp)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER - In light of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 19), Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Original Complaint (Doc. No. 15) is DENIED as moot and without prejudice to refile. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/29/2019) (chmb) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (svc).
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Vivint Inc filed by Portus Singapore Pte Ltd, Portus Pty Ltd. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) A-1, #4 Exhibit(s) B-1) (Moore, Stevenson)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER IN PATENT CASES: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer as soon as practicable, but in no event later than 20 days from the date of this order. The Joint Report shall be filed no later than 10 days from the date of the scheduling conference. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/9/2019) (rekc)
May 8, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vivint Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Blackstone Group LP, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Vivint Group, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate APX Group, Inc. for Vivint Inc. (Stout, Stephen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 16 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Vivint Inc re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Klein, Eric)
May 8, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Vivint Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klein, Eric)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen C. Stout on behalf of Vivint Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Stout, Stephen)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fred I Williams on behalf of Vivint Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Williams, Fred)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. Vivint Inc answer or response due 5/8/2019. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/5/2019) (chmb)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Second) filed by Vivint Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klein, Eric)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. Vivint Inc answer or response due 4/8/2019. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/27/2019) (chmb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Vivint Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klein, Eric)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric J Klein on behalf of Vivint Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Klein, Eric)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Vivint Inc ; served on 2/14/2019. (Moore, Stevenson)
February 7, 2019 Judge Ed Kinkeade added pursuant to Special Order 3-287. Judge Sam A Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (ewd)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Vivint Inc. (mla)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mla)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Report on Filing or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark - AO120 filed by Portus Pty Ltd, Portus Singapore Pte Ltd. (Wang, Timothy)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Portus Pty Ltd, Portus Singapore Pte Ltd identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Portus Singapore Pte Ltd for Portus Pty Ltd. (Wang, Timothy)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Vivint Inc filed by Portus Singapore Pte Ltd, Portus Pty Ltd. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9762441) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) A-1, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) B-1) (Wang, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portus Singapore Pte Ltd et al v. Vivint Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivint, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivint Inc
Represented By: Eric J Klein
Represented By: Sean P Belding
Represented By: Stephen C. Stout
Represented By: Fred I Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portus Singapore Pte Ltd.
Represented By: Stevenson Moore, V
Represented By: Timothy Tiewei Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portus Pty Ltd.
Represented By: Stevenson Moore, V
Represented By: Timothy Tiewei Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portus Singapore Pte Ltd
Represented By: Stevenson Moore, V
Represented By: Timothy Tiewei Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portus Pty Ltd
Represented By: Stevenson Moore, V
Represented By: Timothy Tiewei Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: Daniel Allen Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ADR Provider
Represented By: Robert Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?