Geographic Location Innovations LLC v. Michael's Stores Inc

Plaintiff: Geographic Location Innovations LLC
Defendant: Michaels Stores Inc and Michael's Stores Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00316
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
0 Judge: Jane J Boyle
1 Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (epm)
March 27, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per #9 Notice of Dismissal. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (epm)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendant Michael's Stores, Inc. filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC (Johnson, Jay)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Michael's Stores Inc ; served on 2/28/2019. (Johnson, Jay)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. Michael's Stores Inc answer or response due 4/22/2019. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/7/2019) (chmb)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Johnson, Jay)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Michael's Stores Inc. (axm)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
February 8, 2019 Judge Ed Kinkeade added pursuant to Special Order 3-287. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to case. (ewd)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ala)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ala)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael's Stores Inc filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9764999) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Johnson, Jay) Modified Jury Demand on 2/7/2019 (ala).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geographic Location Innovations LLC v. Michael's Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michaels Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael's Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geographic Location Innovations LLC
Represented By: D Bradley Kizzia
Represented By: Jay B Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?