Fish v. Carter et al
Plaintiff: Randa Hadeed Fish
Defendant: Demetrices Carter and USA Truck Inc
Undetermined: ADR Provider
Case Number: 3:2019cv00326
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 Designation of Mediator by Demetrices Carter, USA Truck Inc. (Johnson, Joseph)
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 (Document Restricted) Sealed Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Randa Hadeed Fish (Brandenburg, Tim)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/7/2019. Settlement Status Report due by 8/14/2019. Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 6/1/2020 before Judge Ed Kinkeade. Joinder of Parties due by 5/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2019. Motions due by 12/20/2019. Pretrial Order due by 5/11/2020. Discovery due by 11/22/2019. Pretrial Materials due by 5/11/2020. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/8/2019) (mla)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Demetrices Carter, USA Truck Inc. (Fisher, Brian)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement by USA Truck Inc. (Mayer, Zach) Modified text on 2/22/2019 (ykp).
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED Notice of Removal by USA Truck Inc, Demetrices Carter. (Mayer, Zach) Modified text on 2/22/2019 (ykp).
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Randa Hadeed Fish. (Brandenburg, Tim)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER: re #5 Order. The Court orders Defendants to properly amend the Notice of Removal to reflect the citizenship of each party within ten (10) days from the date this order is signed. Each party's Certificate of Interested Persons must also properly reflect the citizenship of each party. Failure to comply with this order will result in remand to state court without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/12/2019) (ndt) Modified on 2/12/2019 (chmb).
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court orders Defendants to properly amend the Notice of Removal to reflect the citizenship of each party within ten (10) days from the date this order is signed. Each party's Certificate of Interested Persons must also properly reflect the citizenship of each party. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/11/2019) (ndt)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER : Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), Rule 26 and the Court's Civil Justice Expense and Delay Reduction Plan (the "Plan"), the Court enters this Order to promote possible early settlement of this action and to facilitate subsequent entry of a Scheduling Order. The Joint Report, which shall be filed no later than 10 days from the date of the scheduling conference. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/11/2019) (ndt)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by USA Truck Inc. (Mayer, Zach)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from the County Court at Law No 5, Dallas County, TX, case number CC-18-06959-E filed by USA Truck Inc, Demetrices Carter. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9768721) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Mayer, Zach)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fish v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demetrices Carter
Represented By: Joseph Edward Johnson, III
Represented By: Zach T Mayer
Represented By: Brian J Fisher
Represented By: Brandon W Maxey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Truck Inc
Represented By: Joseph Edward Johnson, III
Represented By: Zach T Mayer
Represented By: Brian J Fisher
Represented By: Brandon W Maxey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randa Hadeed Fish
Represented By: Tim Brandenburg
Represented By: Roger D Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: ADR Provider
Represented By: Karen M Gammon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?