EVS Codec Technologies LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al

Plaintiff: EVS Codec Technologies LLC and Saint Lawrence Communications LLC
Defendant: ZTE USA Inc, ZTE Corporation and ZTE (TX) Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00385
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 77 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against ZTE Corporation, ZTE USA Inc filed by Saint Lawrence Communications LLC, EVS Codec Technologies LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/10/2019 03:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1570, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/8/2019) (epm)
April 2, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Masood Anjom on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Anjom, Masood)
March 28, 2019 Filing 74 ANSWER to #62 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by ZTE USA Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., Amended COUNTERCLAIM against EVS Codec Technologies LLC, Saint Lawrence Communications LLC filed by ZTE USA Inc (Davis, Harold)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/26/2019) (svc) Modified docket text on 3/27/2019 (zkc).
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2019 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1570, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/26/2019) (svc)
March 22, 2019 Filing 71 Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Protective Order filed by EVS Codec Technologies LLC, Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proposed Protective Order) (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
March 22, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures filed by EVS Codec Technologies LLC, Saint Lawrence Communications LLC (Simmons, Brian)
March 22, 2019 Filing 69 Designation of Mediator by EVS Codec Technologies LLC, Saint Lawrence Communications LLC. (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
March 15, 2019 Filing 68 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order by EVS Codec Technologies LLC, Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
March 15, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-1 & 3-2 Infringement Contentions filed by EVS Codec Technologies LLC, Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC (Lipski, Alisa)
March 15, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel E Burnim on behalf of ZTE USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Burnim, Rachel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harold H. Davis, Jr on behalf of ZTE USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Davis, Harold)
March 15, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nelson Moon Hua on behalf of ZTE USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hua, Nelson)
March 15, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Y Chen on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Chen, Justin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 62 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against ZTE Corporation, ZTE USA Inc filed by Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC, EVS Codec Technologies LLC. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
March 13, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian E Simmons on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Simmons, Brian)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #49 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Burnim. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/11/2019) (epm)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #48 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harold Davis. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 3/11/2019) (epm)
March 8, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Alexander Killingsworth on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies LLC, Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Killingsworth, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Weining Bai on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Bai, Weining)
March 8, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Dean McBride on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McBride, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Wayne Clark on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Clark, Scott)
March 8, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alisa Anne Lipski on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lipski, Alisa)
March 7, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amir H Alavi on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Alavi, Amir)
March 7, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Demetrios Anaipakos on behalf of Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
March 7, 2019 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Acacia Research Group LLC for Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC. (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
March 7, 2019 Filing 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against ZTE (TX) Inc, ZTE Corporation, ZTE USA Inc filed by EVS Codec Technologies LLC, Saint Lawrence Communications, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Anaipakos, Demetrios)
March 4, 2019 Filing 49 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9821986) filed by ZTE USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Burnim, Rachel)
March 4, 2019 Filing 48 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9821982) filed by ZTE USA Inc (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Additional Admissions, #2 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Davis, Harold)
March 1, 2019 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ZTE USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate ZTE Corporation for ZTE USA Inc, ZTE USA Inc. (Cooper, Adam)
March 1, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by ZTE USA Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against EVS Codec Technologies LLC filed by ZTE USA Inc (Cooper, Adam)
March 1, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Cooper on behalf of ZTE USA Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Cooper, Adam)
February 22, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 44. Fri Feb 22 16:32:30 CST 2019 (crt)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/15/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/22/2019) (zkc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 43 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ala)
February 15, 2019 Filing 42 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ala)
February 15, 2019 Filing 41 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00344. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ravinder Singh Deol terminated Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/07/2019. (klc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ZTE USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deol, Ravinder) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #26 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/10/2019. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ZTE (TX), Inc. Without Prejudice filed by EVS Codec Technologies, LLC, denied as moot #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by ZTE (TX), Inc.., ZTE (TX), Inc. terminated., Attorney Ravinder Singh Deol; Rachel E. Burnim and Harold Davis Davis, Jr terminated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/5/2018. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Erik J Dykema and Keana Theresa Taylor terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/5/2018. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ZTE (TX), Inc. Without Prejudice by EVS Codec Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simmons, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
November 1, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 28, Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ZTE (TX), Inc.. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Upshaw PLLC to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for ZTE (USA), Inc. and ZTE (TX) Inc. and to Terminate ECF Notifications)(Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ravinder Singh Deol on behalf of ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE USA, Inc. (Deol, Ravinder) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel E. Burnim on behalf of ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE USA, Inc. (Burnim, Rachel) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harold Davis Davis, Jr on behalf of ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE USA, Inc. (Davis, Harold) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 Opposed MOTION to Stay re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by EVS Codec Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simmons, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by EVS Codec Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian E. Simmons, #2 Exhibit 1 - Simmons Decl, #3 Exhibit 2 - Simmons Decl, #4 Exhibit 3 - Simmons Decl, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Simmons, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 28 FILED IN ERROR Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ZTE (TX), Inc. by EVS Codec Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simmons, Brian) Modified on 11/1/2018 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 27 STIPULATION by EVS Codec Technologies, LLC. (Clark, Scott) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 26 Opposed MOTION to Stay re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by ZTE (TX), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Dykema, Erik) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ZTE USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Dykema, Erik) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ZTE (TX), Inc. to 10/9/2018. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ZTE USA, Inc. to 10/9/2018. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZTE (TX), Inc..( Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZTE USA, Inc..( Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ZTE (TX), Inc. to 9/30/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ZTE USA, Inc. to 9/29/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZTE (TX), Inc..( Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZTE USA, Inc..( Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 30, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR - was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 18 and 19, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 19 FILED IN ERROR MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by ZTE (TX), Inc.. (Taylor, Keana) Modified on 8/30/2018 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 FILED IN ERROR MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by ZTE USA, Inc.. (Taylor, Keana) Modified on 8/30/2018 (nkl, ). [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keana Theresa Taylor on behalf of ZTE (TX), Inc. (Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keana Theresa Taylor on behalf of ZTE USA, Inc. (Taylor, Keana) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EVS Codec Technologies, LLC. ZTE USA, Inc. served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EVS Codec Technologies, LLC. ZTE (TX), Inc. served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (Anaipakos, Demetrios) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Yee-Jin Chen on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (Chen, Justin) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Weining Bai on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (Bai, Weining) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alisa Anne Lipski on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (Lipski, Alisa) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott W Clark on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (Clark, Scott) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Dean McBride on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (McBride, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Masood Anjom on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (Anjom, Masood) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Ervin Simmons on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (Simmons, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amir H. Alavi on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (Alavi, Amir) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Demetrios Anaipakos on behalf of EVS Codec Technologies, LLC (Anaipakos, Demetrios) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 7, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 7, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to ZTE (TX), Inc. c/o Ferguson, Braswell & Fraser, PC, ZTE Corporation, ZTE USA, Inc. c/o Incorp Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) ZTE Corporation, #2 Summons(es) \ZTE USA, Inc.)(nkl, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6886197.), filed by EVS Codec Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 2/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVS Codec Technologies LLC v. ZTE Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTE USA Inc
Represented By: Harold Davis Davis, Jr
Represented By: Ravinder Singh Deol
Represented By: Keana Theresa Taylor
Represented By: Erik J Dykema
Represented By: Rachel E. Burnim
Represented By: Nelson Moon Hua
Represented By: Harold H. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Adam Cooper
Represented By: Rachel E Burnim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTE Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTE (TX) Inc
Represented By: Harold Davis Davis, Jr
Represented By: Ravinder Singh Deol
Represented By: Keana Theresa Taylor
Represented By: Erik J Dykema
Represented By: Rachel E. Burnim
Represented By: Harold H. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel E Burnim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVS Codec Technologies LLC
Represented By: Demetrios Anaipakos
Represented By: Justin Yee-Jin Chen
Represented By: Weining Bai
Represented By: Brian Ervin Simmons
Represented By: Amir H Alavi
Represented By: Masood Anjom
Represented By: Alisa Anne Lipski
Represented By: Michael Dean McBride
Represented By: Scott W Clark
Represented By: Michael Alexander Killingsworth
Represented By: Scott Wayne Clark
Represented By: Brian E Simmons
Represented By: Justin Y Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Lawrence Communications LLC
Represented By: Demetrios Anaipakos
Represented By: Weining Bai
Represented By: Amir H Alavi
Represented By: Masood Anjom
Represented By: Alisa Anne Lipski
Represented By: Michael Dean McBride
Represented By: Michael Alexander Killingsworth
Represented By: Scott Wayne Clark
Represented By: Brian E Simmons
Represented By: Justin Y Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?