Gambino v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: David A Gambino
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00413
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-10374 in USCA5 for #8 Notice of Appeal, filed by David A Gambino. (epm)
April 3, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Wed Apr 3 09:22:08 CDT 2019 (crt)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #7 Judgment to the Fifth Circuit by David A Gambino. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Attachments: #1 Transcript Order Form) (ykp)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT: This action is summarily DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/19/2019) (axm)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Accepting #4 Findings and Recommendation. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 3/19/2019) (axm)
March 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Tue Mar 19 12:02:37 CDT 2019 (crt)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Findings and Recommendations. (ndt)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Case re: #3 Complaint. The Court should summarily dismiss this action with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/22/2019) (ykp)
February 22, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Feb 22 10:08:12 CST 2019 (crt)
February 20, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Wed Feb 20 16:36:15 CST 2019 (crt)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against John Doe, John Doe filed by David A Gambino. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (rekc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (rekc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc)
February 19, 2019 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by David A Gambino. (Please see #3 for image.) (rekc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gambino v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Gambino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?