Ward v. Johnson & Johnson Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Elie S Ward
Defendant: DePuy Products Inc, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy International Limited and Johnson & Johnson Inc
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 3:2019cv00594
Filed: March 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-01440. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #311. Opposition period had expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Texas for inclusion into MDL-2244 DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. James Edgar Kinkeade, U.S. District Judge. (plp) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/12/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Defendants are to file an Answer to the Complaint in this matter by March 25, 2019. The Rule 16 Initial Conference and the deadline for the parties to submit a proposed Civil Case Management and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date and will be rescheduled upon the filing of Defendants' Answers. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/8/2019. (mab) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/12/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS: regarding MDL Docket No. 2244, filed by John H. Beisner, Esq., on behalf of DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., and Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (jmb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/12/2019.]
February 28, 2019 ***Answer deadline reset/corrected for DePuy International Limited to 3/25/2019. (jmb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/12/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elie S. Ward. Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Ferlazzo, Salvatore) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/12/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elie S. Ward. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Ferlazzo, Salvatore) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/12/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elie S. Ward. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Ferlazzo, Salvatore) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/12/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Waiver of Service served on William Hahn, Esq. on 1/23/2019, filed by Elie S. Ward., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elie S. Ward. Depuy Products, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Ferlazzo, Salvatore) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/12/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Waiver of Service served on William Hahn, Esq. on 2/18/2019, filed by Elie S. Ward., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Elie S. Ward. DePuy International Limited waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Ferlazzo, Salvatore) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/12/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to N.D.N.Y.L.R. 4.1 (b), the sixty (60) day time frame within which service of the Summons and Complaint upon the Defendants was to be completed has expired. If service has been completed then proper proof of such service shall be filed. Plaintiff is directed to advise the Court of the status of this matter by March 6, 2019. SO ORDERED Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/26/2019. (mab) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/12/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/6/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/12/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Johnson & Johnson, Inc., #2 Summons issued for Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., #3 Summons issued for Depuy Products, Inc., #4 Summons issued for DePuy International, Limited) (jmb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/12/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: against Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Depuy Products, Inc., and DePuy International Limited (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4591285) filed by Elie S. Ward. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Johnson & Johnson Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Products Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elie S Ward
Represented By: Salvatore D. Ferlazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?