Martinelli v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Angelo Martinelli
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International and Depuy Inc
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 3:2019cv00595
Filed: March 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 Case electronically transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-03146. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDEER (CTO-311) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 18-cv-01346-MEH, to the Northern District of Texas, to become part of MDL 2244, by Clerk on 3/11/2019. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Filed Tagalong by Karla H. Carrigan on behalf of Angelo Martinelli (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document Schedule of Related Action)(Carrigan, Karla) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 2/26/2019. Counsel advised the Court that this case is tagged to be included in a pending Multi District Litigation. Parties will file a document regarding same. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angelo Martinelli. Johnson & Johnson served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019; Johnson & Johnson International served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019; Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (Worstell, David) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angelo Martinelli. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019; Depuy Inc. served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Worstell, David) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Angelo Martinelli All parties do not consent.. (Worstell, David) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/25/2019. (tsher, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #5 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Angelo Martinelli. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document Proof of Service)(Carrigan, Karla) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue by Plaintiff Angelo Martinelli. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Carrigan, Karla) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/25/2019. Scheduling Conference is converted into a Status Conference and is set for 2/26/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/10/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Karla H. Carrigan. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Karla H. Carrigan. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6428399)Attorney Karla H. Carrigan added to party Angelo Martinelli(pty:pla), filed by Angelo Martinelli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Carrigan, Karla) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinelli v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Martinelli
Represented By: David Lewis Worstell
Represented By: Karla Hirsch Carrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?