Perez v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC et al

Plaintiff: Antonia Perez
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC and Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Not Yet Classified: ADR Provider
Case Number: 3:2019cv00715
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 (Document Restricted) Plaintiffs Fed. R. CIv. P. 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Antonia Perez (Trujillo, James)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing of Written Discovery filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC (Staub, Derek)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. The court appoints Mark W Gilbert as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation by 90 days before trial. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/26/2019) (mla)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for jury trial on the Court's three-week docket beginning 6/8/2020 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Joinder of Parties due by 8/16/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2019. Discovery due by 12/20/2019. Motions due by 12/20/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/25/2019) (zkc)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Scheduling Conference held on 4/25/2019. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - N/A; Defense - Derek Ryan Staub. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :20. (chmb)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Scheduling Order by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. (Staub, Derek)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. Amended Rule 26 Joint Report. (Staub, Derek)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Joint Submission on Discovery Matters by Antonia Perez. (Trujillo, James)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference for 4/25/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/10/2019) (zkc)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. (Davis, Derek)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from County Court at Law No 4, Dallas County, TX, case number CC-19-01078-D filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9867343) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s): Index of State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC
Represented By: Derek Ryan Staub
Represented By: Derek S Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Derek Ryan Staub
Represented By: Derek S Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonia Perez
Represented By: James Duane Trujillo
Represented By: David Lira Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ADR Provider
Represented By: Mark W Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?