Burkes v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Louis Burkes
Defendant: DePuy Products Inc, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy International Limited and Johnson & Johnson
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 3:2019cv01071
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Johnson & Johnson. Waiver sent on 4/16/2019. (Ibert, Jessica)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. Waiver sent on 4/16/2019. (Ibert, Jessica)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DePuy Products Inc. Waiver sent on 4/16/2019. (Ibert, Jessica)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. Waiver sent on 4/16/2019. (Ibert, Jessica)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to DePuy International Limited. Waiver sent on 4/16/2019. (Ibert, Jessica)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-09312. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of MDL Transfer to District of Northern Texas. MDL case number is 2244. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/3/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2244. (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/3/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Judge Lance M Africk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/15/19.(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/3/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (djg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/3/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7565355) filed by Louis Burkes. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)Attorney Jessica Lynne Ibert added to party Louis Burkes(pty:pla).(Ibert, Jessica) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/16/2019) (am). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/16/2019) (am). Modified text on 4/16/2019 (am). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burkes v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Products Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Burkes
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Ibert
Represented By: David Alan Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?