Marek Brother Systems Inc v. Enriquez et al

Plaintiff: Marek Brother Systems Inc
Defendant: JP Acoustics and Drywall LLC and Juan Enriquez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01082
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY filed by Marek Brother Systems Inc re: #23 Response/Objection. (ndt)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File. Accordingly, the court directs the clerk of court to file under seal Exhibit A to Bret Young's Reply Affidavit. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/28/2019) (chmb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to File. Accordingly, the court directs the clerk of court to file Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Injunctive Relief (Doc. 25-1) as of the date of this order. No further written material shall be filed regarding Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Injunctive Relief. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/28/2019) (chmb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT A TO BRET YOUNG'S REPLY AFFIDAVIT filed by Marek Brother Systems Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Cleary, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File TO FILE ITS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Marek Brother Systems Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Cleary, James)
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Vacation Letter filed by Juan Enriquez, JP Acoustics and Drywall LLC (Harry, Peter)
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 Supplemental Response and Brief In Opposition filed by Juan Enriquez, JP Acoustics and Drywall LLC re: #14 Motion for Injunction. (aaa)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/25/2019) (aaa)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File. Accordingly, the court directs the clerk of court to file Defendants' Supplemental Response and Brief in Opposition and Affidavit to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Injunction Relief (Doc. 201-1),(Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/25/2019) (chmb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response and Brief in Opposition and Affidavit to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Injunctive Relief filed by Juan Enriquez, JP Acoustics and Drywall LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Harry, Peter)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY filed by Marek Brother Systems Inc re: #14 MOTION for Injunction (PRELIMINARY) MOTION for Hearing (EXPEDITED) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Cleary, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Marek Brother Systems Inc re #14 MOTION for Injunction (PRELIMINARY) MOTION for Hearing (EXPEDITED) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Cleary, James)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Juan Enriquez, JP Acoustics and Drywall LLC re: #14 MOTION for Injunction (PRELIMINARY) MOTION for Hearing (EXPEDITED) (Harry, Peter)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER deeming moot #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary and Permanent Injunction. The court denies without prejudice Plaintiff's request for an expedited hearing in the Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing (Doc. #14 ). Response to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 6/14/2019, at 5:00 p.m. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 6/11/2019) (zkc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (AGREED) filed by Marek Brother Systems Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cleary, James)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING filed by Marek Brother Systems Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cleary, James) Modified title on 6/10/2019 (ctf).
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Juan Enriquez, JP Acoustics and Drywall LLC. (Harry, Peter)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint; RESPONSE to #4 Application for Temporary and Permanent Injunctive Relief filed by Juan Enriquez, JP Acoustics and Drywall LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Peter J Harry added to party Juan Enriquez(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J Harry added to party JP Acoustics and Drywall LLC(pty:dft) (Harry, Peter) Modified to add document linkage on 5/30/2019 (zkc).
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Defense Counsel Accepting Service on Behalf of Defendants Juan Enriquez and JP Acoustics and Drywall, LLC filed by Marek Brother Systems Inc (Cleary, James)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Juan Enriquez. (ndt)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to issue SUMMONS FOR JUAN ENRIQUEZ filed by Marek Brother Systems Inc. (Cleary, James)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Juan Enriquez, JP Acoustics and Drywall LLC. (ndt)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue SUMMONS TO JUAN ENRIQUEZ AND JP ACOUSTICS & DRYWALL, LLC filed by Marek Brother Systems Inc. (Cleary, James)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The court will wait until after Plaintiff effects service on Defendants and the summonses are returned executed and filed with the court before setting a deadline for Defendants to respond to the Application. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 5/7/2019) (svc)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Ed Kinkeade recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Sam A Lindsay for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-CV-1082-L. (ewd)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by Marek Brother Systems Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Granting Plaintiff's Temporary Restraining Order)Attorney James M Cleary, Jr added to party Marek Brother Systems Inc(pty:pla) (Cleary, James) Modified title on 5/7/2019 (ctf).
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marek Brother Systems, Inc.. (Dyer, Mark)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Juan Enriquez, JP Acoustics & Drywall, LLC filed by Marek Brother Systems, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9966486) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E) (Dyer, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marek Brother Systems Inc v. Enriquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marek Brother Systems Inc
Represented By: James M Cleary, Jr
Represented By: Mark J Dyer
Represented By: W Jackson Wisdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Acoustics and Drywall LLC
Represented By: Peter J Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Enriquez
Represented By: Peter J Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?