SkyGlass Inc v. Freight Star Inc et al

Plaintiff: SKYGLASS, INC. and SkyGlass Inc
Defendant: Freight Star, Inc., Partner Ship, LLC, Freight Star Inc and Partner Ship LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01087
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by SkyGlass Inc re: #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Frels, Mark)
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Freight Star Inc re: #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Ekvall, Erik)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Freight Star Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ekvall, Erik)
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY filed by Partner Ship LLC re: #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Kern, Benjamen)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David M Kruger. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/5/2019) (ndt)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kelly E Mulrane. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/5/2019) (ndt)
June 5, 2019 Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Partner Ship LLC re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim PARTIAL DISMISSAL (Kern, Benjamen)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Partner Ship LLC (Kern, Benjamen)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/3/2019) (mla) Modified hearing date on 6/3/2019 (axm).
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by SkyGlass Inc (Frels, Mark)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Kita on behalf of Freight Star Inc, Partner Ship LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Kita, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot: The Court denies as moot Defendant Partner Ship LLC's Motion to Dismiss #5 in light of Plaintiff Sky Glass's Amended Complaint #11 . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/24/2019) (chmb)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Partner Ship LLC, Freight Star Inc filed by SkyGlass Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Frels, Mark)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Freight Star Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Erik E Ekvall added to party Freight Star Inc(pty:dft) (Ekvall, Erik)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Freight Star Inc of Defendant's Original Answer (Ekvall, Erik)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9996410) filed by Partner Ship LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David M Krueger added to party Partner Ship LLC(pty:dft) (Krueger, David)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9994228) filed by Partner Ship LLC (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Kelly E Mulrane added to party Partner Ship LLC(pty:dft) (Mulrane, Kelly)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Partner Ship LLC re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Kern, Benjamen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Partner Ship LLC (Kern, Benjamen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental Document by Partner Ship LLC as to #2 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 4) (Kern, Benjamen)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 160th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC1905310 filed by Partner Ship, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9967462.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3) (Kern, Benjamen) Modified text to add the receipt number on 5/7/2019 (ykp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Partner Ship, LLC. (Kern, Benjamen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SkyGlass Inc v. Freight Star Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freight Star, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partner Ship, LLC
Represented By: Benjamen E Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freight Star Inc
Represented By: Amy Beth Pollock
Represented By: Erik E Ekvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partner Ship LLC
Represented By: Benjamen E Kern
Represented By: Kelly E Mulrane
Represented By: Matthew J Kita
Represented By: David M Krueger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKYGLASS, INC.
Represented By: Mark C Frels
Represented By: Mark H How
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SkyGlass Inc
Represented By: Mark C Frels
Represented By: Mark H How
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?