Dunn v. United Revenue Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Johnny Dunn
Defendant: United Revenue Corporation and Experian Information Solutions Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01110
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Johnny Dunn (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Text) (Klote, Gregory)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 7/16/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/25/2019) (ndt)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Anthony, Rebecca)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by United Revenue Corporation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Farrar, Zachary)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 , #9 Motions for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint. United Revenue Corporation answer due 6/24/2019. Experian Information Solutions Inc answer due 6/25/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/3/2019) (zkc)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Experian plc, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Anthony, Rebecca)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Rebecca Wernicke Anthony added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc(pty:dft) (Anthony, Rebecca)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer United Revenue Corporation's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by United Revenue Corporation Attorney Zachary C Farrar added to party United Revenue Corporation(pty:dft) (Farrar, Zachary)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United Revenue Corporation ; served on 5/13/2019. (Klote, Gregory)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Experian Information Solutions Inc ; served on 5/14/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chris R Miltenberger on behalf of Johnny Dunn. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Miltenberger, Chris)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions Inc, United Revenue Corporation. (zkc)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnny Dunn. (Klote, Gregory)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Experian Information Solutions Inc, United Revenue Corporation filed by Johnny Dunn. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9973672) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A: Dispute Letter, #2 Exhibit B: Updated Credit Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Klote, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. United Revenue Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Revenue Corporation
Represented By: Zachary C Farrar
Represented By: David J Drez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Rebecca Wernicke Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Dunn
Represented By: Joel Spencer Halvorsen
Represented By: Gregory Motil
Represented By: Gregory Michael Klote
Represented By: Chris R Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?