Greenhaw v. Credit Systems International Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Greenhaw
Defendant: Credit Systems International Inc and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01120
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jin Seock Shin on behalf of Credit Systems International Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Shin, Jin Seock) Modified filer on 6/19/2019 (ykp).
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Credit Systems International Inc. (Malone, Robbie)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Credit Systems International Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Malone, Robbie)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Credit Systems International Inc; served on 5/13/2019. (Halvorsen, Joel)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #1 Complaint, filed by Credit Systems International Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robbie L Malone added to party Credit Systems International Inc(pty:dft) (Malone, Robbie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC ; served on 5/14/2019. (Halvorsen, Joel)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Credit Systems International Inc, Equifax Information Services LLC. (zkc)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jennifer Greenhaw. (Halvorsen, Joel)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Credit Systems International Inc, Equifax Information Services LLC filed by Jennifer Greenhaw. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9977092) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Dispute Letter, #2 Exhibit B: Updated Credit Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Halvorsen, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenhaw v. Credit Systems International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Systems International Inc
Represented By: Jacob Michael Bach
Represented By: Jin Seock Shin
Represented By: Robbie L Malone
Represented By: Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Jin Seock Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Greenhaw
Represented By: Joel Spencer Halvorsen
Represented By: Gregory Motil
Represented By: Gregory Michael Klote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?