White v. National Credit Adjusters LLC et al
Plaintiff: Delkem White
Defendant: Trans Union Corp and National Credit Adjusters LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01128
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per 18 Electronic Order. (aaa)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER: In view of the impending settlement, the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/25/2019) (Judge Jane J. Boyle)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The parties have announced that this case has been resolved. Any trial setting and scheduling order are vacated. The parties have sixty (60) days to file dismissal papers. If the parties do not file dismissal papers by 8/18/2019, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/21/2019) (ykp)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of the parties' announcement of a settlement, the FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 11:00 AM is hereby cancelled. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/21/2019) (ext)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement-Correct PDF filed by Delkem White (Motil, Gregory)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 ***DISREGARD, ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** NOTICE of Settlement filed by Delkem White. (Motil, Gregory) Modified on 6/19/2019 (mla).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 11:00 AM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Lead counsel and/or local counsel for each party, and all unrepresented parties, shall be present. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/5/2019) (ykp)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 Court Request for Recusal: Judge Jane J. Boyle recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-cv-1128-S. (axm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union Corp identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion for Trans Union Corp. (Merar, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Trans Union Corp. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Michael Merar added to party Trans Union Corp(pty:dft) (Merar, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Credit Adjusters LLC. (Malone, Robbie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by National Credit Adjusters LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Robbie L Malone added to party National Credit Adjusters LLC(pty:dft) (Malone, Robbie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chris R Miltenberger on behalf of Delkem White. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Miltenberger, Chris)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National Credit Adjusters LLC ; served on 5/13/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Trans Union Corp ; served on 5/13/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to National Credit Adjusters LLC, Trans Union Corp. (zkc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Delkem White. (Klote, Gregory)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against National Credit Adjusters, LLC, Trans Union Corp. filed by Delkem White. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9978727) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A- Dispute Letter, #3 Exhibit(s) B- Updated Credit Report) (Klote, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. National Credit Adjusters LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delkem White
Represented By: Joel Spencer Halvorsen
Represented By: Gregory Motil
Represented By: Gregory Michael Klote
Represented By: Chris R Miltenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union Corp
Represented By: Michael Merar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters LLC
Represented By: Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV
Represented By: Robbie L Malone
Represented By: Cooper Morgan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?