Stephens v. Verizon Wireless Texas LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel I Stephens, II
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Texas LLC
Not Yet Classified: ADR Provider
Case Number: 3:2019cv01138
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Referring Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) filed by Verizon Wireless Texas LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jorgensen, Brian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 22 Designation of Experts by Daniel I Stephens, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Expert Bio Summary) (Atkerson, Dan)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Special Order 3-333: Effective September 3, 2019, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Judge Brantley Starr's docket and shall henceforth be designated by the suffix letter "X." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/27/2019) (ctf)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Scheduling Conference held on 8/9/2019. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Dan Atkerson; Defense - Brian Jorgensen and Enrique Lemus. (Court Reporter: Lanie Smith) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :11. (chmb)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 11/9/2020 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Motions due by 3/27/2020. Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/9/2019) (axm) (Main Document 19 replaced on 8/12/2019) (chmb). Modified on 8/12/2019 (chmb).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Kathy Fragnoli as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation within 90 days. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/9/2019) (axm)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2019) (epm)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Verizon Wireless Texas LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate MCI Communications Services, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Verizon Americas Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Verizon Communications Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Bell Atlantic Mobile Systems LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate GTE Wireless LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate GTE Wireless of the Midwest Incorporated, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate GTE LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Verizon Americas Finance 1 Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Verizon Wireless South Area, LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Cellco Partnership for Verizon Wireless Texas LLC. (Jorgensen, Brian)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Verizon Wireless Texas LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Jorgensen, Brian)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Verizon Wireless Texas LLC answer due 6/28/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/24/2019) (rekc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Verizon Wireless Texas LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer) (Lemus, Enrique)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/19/2019) (mla)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION Leave to Appear Without Local Counsel filed by Daniel I Stephens, II with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Atkerson, Dan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Court Request for Recusal: The referral judge in this case has been reassigned via random assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. U.S. Magistrate Judge David L. Horan is no longer assigned to the case. (ctf)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint is extended, up to and including 6/24/2019. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/6/2019) (aaa)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Unless exempted, Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in or maintain their principal office in this district. To date, one or more of the parties has failed to comply with Local Rule 83.10 or file a motion for leave to appear without local counsel. The parties have twenty days from this date to comply if they have not already done so. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/6/2019) (ext)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Verizon Wireless Texas LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jorgensen, Brian)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian M Jorgensen on behalf of Verizon Wireless Texas LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Jorgensen, Brian)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Enrique Alfonso Lemus on behalf of Verizon Wireless Texas LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lemus, Enrique)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Verizon Wireless Texas LLC. (zkc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Daniel I. Stephens, II. (Atkerson, Dan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Verizon Wireless Texas LLC filed by Daniel I Stephens II. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9981782) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Atkerson, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. Verizon Wireless Texas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Texas LLC
Represented By: Brian M Jorgensen
Represented By: Enrique Alfonso Lemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel I Stephens, II
Represented By: Dan A Atkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ADR Provider
Represented By: Kathy Fragnoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?