Lucid Energy Delaware LLC v. Marquette Commercial Finance et al

Plaintiff: Lucid Energy Delaware LLC
Defendant: Blitz Energy Services LLC, Addy Source LLC, Marquette Commercial Finance and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01148
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 Appendix in Support filed by Marquette Commercial Finance re #14 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Smith, Brian)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Marquette Commercial Finance re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Smith, Brian)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Marquette Commercial Finance (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Brian J Smith added to party Marquette Commercial Finance(pty:dft) (Smith, Brian)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Addy Source LLC (rekc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default filed by Lucid Energy Delaware LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Szygenda Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Szygenda, Aimee)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by United States of America (Miller, G)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that MTFs counterclaim against Lucid be, and is hereby, dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/7/2019) (svc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marquette Commercial Finance identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate UMB Bank N A, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate UMB Financial Corporation for Marquette Commercial Finance. (Schulte, David)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Dismissal of Certain Claim Without Prejudice filed by Marquette Commercial Finance (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schulte, David)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff Lucid's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Defendant Marquette Commercial Finance's Counterclaim. Answer or response otherwise due on 6/11/19. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/20/2019) (chmb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Defendant Marquette Commercial Finance's Counterclaim filed by Lucid Energy Delaware LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Aimee Guidry Szygenda added to party Lucid Energy Delaware LLC(pty:pla) (Szygenda, Aimee)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America (Internal Revenue Service). (Miller, G)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Supplemental Document by United States of America (Internal Revenue Service) as to #1 Notice of Removal United States' Notice of Supplement to the Record from State Court and Index. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13) (Miller, G)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 68th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-04394 filed by United States of America (Internal Revenue Service). (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Miller, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucid Energy Delaware LLC v. Marquette Commercial Finance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucid Energy Delaware LLC
Represented By: Andrew J Szygenda
Represented By: Robert K Wise
Represented By: Thomas F Lillard
Represented By: Aimee Guidry Szygenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blitz Energy Services LLC
Represented By: Jason S Brookner
Represented By: Charles W Sartain
Represented By: Amber Michelle Chambers
Represented By: Amber Michelle Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addy Source LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Commercial Finance
Represented By: David C. Schulte
Represented By: Robert W Jones
Represented By: Brian J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: G Hobart Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?