Shiloh Missionary Baptist Church v. Western World Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Shiloh Missionary Baptist Church
Defendant: Patrick Elza and Western World Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01185
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. The Court hereby waives the requirement to proceed with local counsel as to the Plaintiff in this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/7/2019) (chmb)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ODER granting #9 the parties' Joint Motion to Suspend Deadlines. In light of the parties' upcoming mediation scheduled for July 23, 2019, the Court hereby suspends the deadline for the parties to file their joint status report on June 26, 2019. Moreover, in light of the scheduled mediation, Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is due (if necessary) on or before August 13, 2019. After the parties complete mediation, they must promptly inform the Court of the outcome of the mediation. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/6/2019) (chmb)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Extend Time initial deadlines and response due date filed by Western World Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hogue, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shiloh Missionary Baptist Church. (McGinnis, Patrick)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand filed by Shiloh Missionary Baptist Church (McGinnis, Patrick)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File for Plaintiff's Counsel to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Shiloh Missionary Baptist Church (McGinnis, Patrick)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 6/26/2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/5/2019) (aaa)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court ORDERS the following: if local counsel fails to appear by Friday, 6/14/2019, Plaintiff must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why local counsel has not yet appeared on its behalf. Failure to comply may result in sanctions. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/5/2019) (aaa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND Amended Notice of Removal against Shiloh Missionary Baptist Church filed by Western World Insurance Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hogue, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 14th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-19-05098 filed by Western World Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9991119) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Hogue, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shiloh Missionary Baptist Church v. Western World Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Elza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western World Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert G Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiloh Missionary Baptist Church
Represented By: Chad Troy Wilson
Represented By: Patrick Connell McGinnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?