Lofton v. Hawkins et al
Plaintiff: Nadia Lofton
Defendant: Mike NLN, Nicholas NLN, Victoria NLN, Tasha NLN, Lap Corp of American Dallas Region, Jessie F, Katie Walbruch, Dr NFN Hawkins, NFN Rolling and UT Southwestern Medical Records Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv01231
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Fri Jul 12 08:27:09 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Nadia Lofton must address the following deficiency: A review of the docket reveals that Plaintiff has not yet registered as a user of the Courts electronic filing system, as required by Local Civil Rule. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 8/2/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/11/2019) (ndt)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Jessie F, NFN Hawkins, Lap Corp of American Dallas Region, Mike NLN, Nicholas NLN, Tasha NLN, Victoria NLN, NFN Rolling, UT Southwestern Medical Records Department, Katie Walbruch filed by Nadia Lofton. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (aaa)
June 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Mon Jun 17 14:42:40 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: Nadia Lofton must address the following deficiency: (1) File an amended complaint in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procdure 8(a); (2) Register to use the Court's electronic filing system. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 7/8/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/17/2019) (egp)
June 11, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 7. Tue Jun 11 10:34:02 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. No process will issue pending completion of screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/11/2019) (chmb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nadia Lofton. (zkc)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. Plaintiff Nadia Lofton must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff did not pay the required filing fee or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis on the court approved form. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915(a). Therefore, Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the required $400.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on the AO 239 form, by 6/13/2019. PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(b). A motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the AO 239 form (AO 239) is available online at http://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/forms/AO239_0.pdf. No process will issue except upon order of the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/23/2019) (chmb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nadia Lofton. (zkc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Jessie F, NFN Hawkins, Lap Corp of American Dallas Region, Mike NLN, Nicholas NLN, Tasha NLN, Victoria NLN, NFN Rolling, UT Southwestern Medical Records Department, Katie Walbruch filed by Nadia Lofton. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc)
May 22, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 1, 2. Wed May 22 11:38:19 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lofton v. Hawkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike NLN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas NLN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria NLN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasha NLN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lap Corp of American Dallas Region
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie F
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Walbruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr NFN Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Rolling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UT Southwestern Medical Records Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Lofton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?