Rose v. Dallas County Texas et al

Plaintiff: Calvin Rose
Defendant: L Lang, Dallas County Texas, J Garrison, S King, R Hamilton, S Castillo, Lupe Valdez and D Adams
Case Number: 3:2019cv01240
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Calvin Rose re #13 Response/Objection to Dallas County's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Roberts, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by Calvin Rose re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) (Roberts, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to S Castillo. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019; J Garrison. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019; R Hamilton. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019; S King. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019; Lupe Valdez. Waiver sent on 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s)) (Roberts, James). (Main Document 12, Attachments 1, 2, 3, 4 replaced with flattened images on 7/11/2019) (ajb). Modified sent date (ajb).
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to L Lang. Waiver sent on 7/8/2019. (Roberts, James) (Main Document 11 replaced with flattened image on 7/11/2019) (ajb).
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to D Adams. Waiver sent on 7/8/2019. (Roberts, James) (Main Document 10 replaced with flattened image on 7/11/2019) (ajb).
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dallas County Texas. (Nicholas, Barbara)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Dallas County Texas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Nicholas, Barbara)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants response to the complaint is due July 1, 2019. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/12/2019) (chmb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Dallas County Texas. Attorney Barbara S Nicholas added to party Dallas County Texas (pty:dft).(Nicholas, Barbara)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dallas County Texas, served on 5/24/2019. (mla)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to D Adams, S Castillo, Dallas County Texas, J Garrison, R Hamilton, S King, L Lang, Lupe Valdez. (zkc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Calvin Rose. (Roberts, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Calvin Rose. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10005031) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Roberts, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Dallas County Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County Texas
Represented By: John Butrus
Represented By: Barbara S Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupe Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Rose
Represented By: Scott H Palmer
Represented By: James Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?