DISH Network LLC et al v. Bailey Streaming TV LLC et al
Plaintiff: NagraStar LLC and DISH Network LLC
Defendant: Jon Antoni Bailey, Bailey Streaming TV LLC and Jon Antoni Bailey individually and doing business as BSTV doing business as Bailey IPTV
Case Number: 3:2019cv01252
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: Barbara MG Lynn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 222
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The undersigned orders that all civil and criminal bench and jury trials, in-person court hearings, and sentencing proceedings scheduled to take place through May 1, 2020, are continued due to concerns about COVID-19 and consistent with the Northern District of Texas's Special Order Nos. 13-5 and 13-6, entered by Chief Judge Barbara Lynn on March 13, and March 18, 2020, respectively. In addition, if the attorneys have been ordered to conduct a face-to-face meeting for purposes of preparing a Rule 26(f) Joint Report, an in-person meeting is no longer required. These continuances do not modify any pending deadlines other than the trial or hearing dates mentioned above. Attorneys should file a motion with the Court to modify any other deadlines unless, as is the case in some cases transferred to this Court from other judges, the scheduling order allows the parties to reset deadlines by agreement without Court approval. Due to the Court's reduced ability to obtain an adequate spectrum of jurors, and due to the reduced availability of attorneys and court staff to be present in courtrooms because of the public health considerations associated with COVID-19, the period of the continuances associated with this Order and Special Order Nos. 13-5 and 13-6 are excluded by the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. 3161(h) and 18 U.S.C. 3161 (h)(7)(A). The Court finds that the ends of justice served by ordering these continuances outweigh the best interests of the public and each defendants right to a speedy trial. In fact, the best interests of the public are served by these continuances. The Court encourages the parties to communicate with opposing counsel and litigants by video or telephone whenever possible. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/19/2020) (lrl)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Special Orders 13-5 and 13-6 re: Court Operations Under the Exigent Circumstances Created by the COVID-19 Pandemic (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/16/2020 and 3/18/2020)(lrl)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER terminating #20 Motion for Judgment. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 2/11/2020) (chmb)
February 7, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by DISH Network LLC, NagraStar LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction) (Hagan, Chad)
November 8, 2019 Case copied to 4:19cv0948-O. Transfer to Fort Worth Division complete; clerk to set Related Case hyperlink, clear unnecessary flags, etc. (ldm)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/8/2019) (aaa)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement Pursuant to the Court Scheduling Order [Dkt. 14] filed by DISH Network LLC, NagraStar LLC. (Hagan, Chad)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Per Special Order 3-335 issued on September 18, 2019, your case has been transferred to Judge Ada Brown. All parties are instructed that any existing scheduling orders and deadlines imposed by the previous judge remain in place unless the parties are otherwise notified by this Court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/8/2019) (cea)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Special Order 3-335: Effective September 18, 2019, the cases listed on Exhibit A to this order are transferred to Judge Ada E. Brown's docket and shall henceforth be designated by the suffix letter "E." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/18/2019) (cea)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Jon Antoni Bailey, Bailey Streaming TV LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Russell, Erin)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for three-week docket beginning 3/8/2021 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 10/31/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2019. Motions due by 11/16/2020. Fact and Expert Discovery due by 8/19/2020. Settlement Status Report due by 11/1/2019. Pretrial Order due by 2/16/2021. Pretrial Materials due by 2/16/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2021 08:30 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/31/2019) (rekc)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erin Kathryn Russell. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/19/2019) (chmb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by DISH Network LLC, NagraStar LLC. (Hagan, Chad)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10082031) filed by Jon Antoni Bailey, Bailey Streaming TV LLC (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) admissions list, #2 Additional Page(s) certificate of good standing)Attorney Erin Kathryn Russell added to party Jon Antoni Bailey(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Kathryn Russell added to party Bailey Streaming TV LLC(pty:dft) (Russell, Erin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jon Antoni Bailey ; served on 5/30/2019. (Hagan, Chad)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bailey Streaming TV LLC ; served on 5/30/2019. (Hagan, Chad)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), Rule 26, and the Court's Civil Justice Expense and Delay Reduction Plan (the "Plan"), the Court enters this Order to promote possible early settlement of this action and to facilitate subsequent entry of a Scheduling Order. Joint Status Report due by 7/1/2019. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/10/2019) (ndt)
June 10, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Mon Jun 10 12:41:16 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Jon Antoni Bailey, Bailey Streaming TV LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (axm) Modified filers on 6/7/2019 (axm).
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jon Antoni Bailey, Bailey Streaming TV LLC. (zkc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DISH Network LLC, NagraStar LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate NagraStar LLC for NagraStar LLC; Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Dish DBS Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Dish Network Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Dish Orbital Corporation for DISH Network LLC. (Gresham, R)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by DISH Network LLC, NagraStar LLC. (Gresham, R)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by DISH Network LLC, NagraStar LLC. (Gresham, R)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by NagraStar LLC, DISH Network LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10009379) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gresham, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISH Network LLC et al v. Bailey Streaming TV LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NagraStar LLC
Represented By: Chad M Hagan
Represented By: R Dean Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISH Network LLC
Represented By: Chad M Hagan
Represented By: R Dean Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Antoni Bailey
Represented By: Erin Kathryn Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bailey Streaming TV LLC
Represented By: Erin Kathryn Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Antoni Bailey individually and doing business as BSTV doing business as Bailey IPTV
Represented By: Erin Kathryn Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?