Okere v. The City of Dallas et al

Plaintiff: Kelechi S Okere
Defendant: The University of Dallas, Southwest Airlines Co, Trinity Railway Express, Member's Building Maintenance LLC, The City of Dallas, Trinity Metro, Dallas Area Rapid Transit, Dallas County Democratic Party and Dallas Life
Case Number: 3:2019cv01253
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 24 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dallas Area Rapid Transit, Dallas County Democratic Party, J Erik Jonsson Library, The Dallas Police Department, The University of Dallas filed by Kelechi S Okere. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Amend/Correct. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) Service of process shall not issue, if at all, until the Court completes its 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) screening of the claims alleged in the third amended complaint. And Okere shall file no further motions for leave to amend until screening is completed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/22/2019) (ykp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION for Leave to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Kelechi S Okere (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment) (Okere, Kelechi) Modified docket text on 7/22/2019 (ajb).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Expedite. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/18/2019) (epm) Modified date on 7/19/2019 (epm).
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Kelechi S Okere (Okere, Kelechi)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dallas Area Rapid Transit, Dallas County Democratic Party, J Erik Jonsson Library, The City of Dallas, The Dallas Police Department, The University of Dallas filed by Kelechi S Okere. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Okere, Kelechi)
June 22, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kelechi S Okere. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Okere, Kelechi)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 Additional Attachments to #13 Amended Complaint filed by Kelechi S Okere. (Okere, Kelechi) Modified on 6/13/2019 (mcrd).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. But service of process shall not issue, if at all, until the Court completes its screening of this action under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/12/2019) (zkc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kelechi S Okere. (Okere, Kelechi) Modified docket event on 6/12/2019 (ajb). (Main Document 15 replaced with flattened image on 6/12/2019) (ajb).
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 Additional Attachments to #13 Amended Complaint by Kelechi S Okere. (Okere, Kelechi) Modified on 6/13/2019 (mcrd).
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kelechi S Okere. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Clerk to issue summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (Okere, Kelechi) (Main Document 13 replaced with flattened image on 6/12/2019) (ajb).
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kelechi S Okere. (Okere, Kelechi) (Main Document 12 replaced with flattened image on 6/12/2019) (ajb).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel Without Prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/4/2019) (svc)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT: Kelechi S Okere must address the following deficiency: Plaintiffs complaint as filed does not meet this plausible factual threshold and is therefore subject to summary dismissal. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 7/5/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/4/2019) (svc) Modified on 6/7/2019 (mcrd).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: Kelechi S Okere must address the following deficiency: Financial Affidavit Incomplete. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 7/5/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/4/2019) (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (svc)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kelechi S Okere. (zkc)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dallas Area Rapid Transit, The City of Dallas, Trinity Metro, Dallas County Democratic Party, Southwest Airlines Co filed by Kelechi S Okere. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (zkc)
May 29, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 1, 2. Wed May 29 08:30:26 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kelechi S Okere (ajb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Kelechi S Okere (ajb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kelechi S Okere. (ajb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Dallas Area Rapid Transit, Dallas Life, Member's Building Maintenance LLC, The City of Dallas, The University of Dallas, Trinity Metro, Trinity Railway Express filed by Kelechi S Okere. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ajb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ajb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ajb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okere v. The City of Dallas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelechi S Okere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Railway Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Member's Building Maintenance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Metro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Area Rapid Transit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County Democratic Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Life
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?