Rinderknecht v. Depuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lee Rinderknecht
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International Inc, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, Depuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, John Does 1-10 and DePuy Inc
Special Master: Special Master
Case Number: 3:2019cv01289
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from District of Montana; Case Number 2:19-cv-00020. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Texas requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District consisting of Notice of Removal and state court pleadings from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District, Gallatin County, case number DV-2019-352A. (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 5/30/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Receipt of Filing with MDL (Notice of Related Actions filed on 5/20/19). (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 5/30/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lee Rinderknecht. (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 5/30/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 2 - Notice of Removal). Original file held in Butte clerk's office. (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 5/30/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2305626. (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 5/30/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District, Gallatin County, case number DV-2019-352A, filed by Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 5/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rinderknecht v. Depuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International Inc
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Maxon R Davis
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Maxon R Davis
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics Inc
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Maxon R Davis
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Maxon R Davis
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Inc
Represented By: Jessica D Miller
Represented By: Maxon R Davis
Represented By: Michael V Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Special Master
Represented By: James M Stanton-2244
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Rinderknecht
Represented By: Maxwell E Kirchhoff
Represented By: Domenic A Cossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?