Brown v. First National Bank of Texas et al

Plaintiff: Michael Keith Brown
Defendant: Speedy Cash, Homeland Security, US Treasury Dept, First National Bank of Texas, Cashnet USA and Experian
Case Number: 3:2019cv01302
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Meeting with Judge filed by Michael Keith Brown (rekc)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff Michael Keith Brown's Request for an Extension of Time to Respond to Notice of Deficiency and ordering that Brown must remedy the deficiencies in the complaint as filed no later than August 9, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/9/2019.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time re: #7 Notice of Deficiency and Order Regarding Complaint, filed by Michael Keith Brown. (axm)
June 6, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Thu Jun 6 14:39:06 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT: Michael Keith Brown must address the following deficiency: The complaint as filed does not meet this plausible factual threshold and is therefore subject to summary dismissal. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 7/8/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/6/2019) (aaa)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Service of process shall not issue, if at all, until the Court completes its screening of this action under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 6/6/2019) (aaa)
May 31, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Fri May 31 13:10:50 CDT 2019 (crt)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Keith Brown. (ndt)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Keith Brown. (ndt)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Cashnet USA, Experian, First National Bank of Texas, Homeland Security, Speedy Cash, US Treasury Dept filed by Michael Keith Brown. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. First National Bank of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedy Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Treasury Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cashnet USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Keith Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?