Trotter v. City of Dallas Texas
Plaintiff: Kristopher Kelly Trotter
Defendant: City of Dallas Texas
Case Number: 3:2019cv01327
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City of Dallas Texas. (Brissette, Jennifer)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Dallas Texas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Brissette, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/18/2019) (chmb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Kristopher Kelly Trotter re #9 First MOTION for Injunction (Trotter, Kristopher)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF KRISTOPHER K. TROTTER'S OPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Kristopher Kelly Trotter (Trotter, Kristopher) Modified title on 7/17/2019 (ctf).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant City of Dallas to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 7/24/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/10/2019) (chmb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Time to File Answer filed by City of Dallas Texas Attorney Jennifer A Brissette added to party City of Dallas Texas(pty:dft) (Brissette, Jennifer)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Dallas Texas ; served on 6/19/2019. (epm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kristopher Kelly Trotter. (epm)
June 3, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Mon Jun 3 14:00:04 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Dallas Texas. (ndt)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against City of Dallas Texas filed by Kristopher Trotter. (Filing fee $400.00; Receipt number DS116588) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trotter v. City of Dallas Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Kelly Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dallas Texas
Represented By: Jennifer C Huggard
Represented By: Jennifer A Brissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?