BAPA Brooklyn 2004 LLC v. PennyMac Loan Services LLC
Plaintiff: BAPA Brooklyn 2004 LLC
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01418
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per #7 Stipulation of Dismissal. (zkc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by BAPA Brooklyn 2004 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Newark, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for one-week docket beginning 5/26/2020 before Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/19/2019) (mla)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT (JOINT SCHEDULING PROPOSAL) filed by PennyMac Loan Services LLC. (Hard-Wilson, Brenda)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/18/2019) (mla)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PennyMac Loan Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC; identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate PennyMac Financial Services Inc; identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate PNMAC Holdings Inc; identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate BlackRock Inc for PennyMac Loan Services LLC. (Hard-Wilson, Brenda) Modified corporate parent on 6/14/2019 (mla).
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 14th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, TX, case number DC-19-06400 filed by PennyMac Loan Services LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10052337) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 A: Civil Cover Sheet, #2 B: Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit C: Index, #4 Exhibit C-1: Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit C-2: Plaintiff's Original Petition, #6 Exhibit C-3: Proposed TRO, #7 Exhibit C-4: TRO, #8 Exhibit C-5: Defendant's Original Answer, #9 Exhibit C-6: Defendant's Verified Denial, Amd Answer, #10 Exhibit C-7: PF's Unopp Application to Extend TRO, #11 Exhibit C-8: Proposed Order Extending TRO, #12 Exhibit D: Dallas Central Appraisal District Property Information) (Hard-Wilson, Brenda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAPA Brooklyn 2004 LLC v. PennyMac Loan Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPA Brooklyn 2004 LLC
Represented By: Robert C Newark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennyMac Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Represented By: Matthew K Hansen
Represented By: Thomas G Yoxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?