Lee v. Experian Information Solutions Inc
Plaintiff: Brian Lee
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company LLC and Experian Information Solutions Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01425
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Brian Lee. (Motil, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/10/2019) (rekc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Experian Information Solutions Inc ; served on 6/18/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Court Request for Recusal: The referral judge for this case has been reassigned via random assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. U.S. Magistrate Judge David L. Horan is no longer assigned to the case. (ctf)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Shimoda, Sayuri)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Sayuri Alexandra Shimoda added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc(pty:dft) (Shimoda, Sayuri)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Defendant Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC filed by Brian Lee (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Motil, Gregory)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Enhanced Recovery Company LLC, served on 6/18/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Enhanced Recovery Company LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc. (svc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Brian Lee. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10054016) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement Certificate of Interested Persons, #2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B) (Motil, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Experian Information Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lee
Represented By: Gregory Motil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Sayuri Alexandra Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?