Finley v. Saul

Plaintiff: Brenton Kyle Finley
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 3:2019cv01449
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Andrew Saul, served on 6/24/2019; U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Texas, served on 6/24/2019; U.S. Attorney General, served on 6/28/2019. (Coats, Christopher) Modified docket text on 8/1/2019 (zkc).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF BRIEFS: Plaintiff shall serve and file a brief setting forth all errors that Plaintiff contends entitle Plaintiff to relief by 9/30/2019. Defendant shall serve and file a brief that responds specifically to each issue that Plaintiff raises by 11/14/2019. Plaintiff may serve and file a brief in reply to Defendant's brief by 12/16/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 7/30/2019) (mcrd)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by all parties and Order Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for all further proceedings. Judge Sam A Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/30/2019) (mla)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Administrative Record consisting of Social Security record filed by Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Chandler, Thomas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of parties' consents to proceed before the magistrate judge filed by Brenton Kyle Finley, Andrew Saul. (ctf)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Andrew Saul. (Chandler, Thomas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Andrew Saul. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Chandler, Thomas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Andrew Saul. (Chandler, Thomas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Andrew Saul. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Thomas E Chandler added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft) (Chandler, Thomas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ndt)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brenton Kyle Finley. (Coats, Christopher) (Main Document 2 replaced to flatten document on 6/19/2019) (ndt).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Brenton Kyle Finley. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10061859) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Coats, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finley v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Thomas E Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenton Kyle Finley
Represented By: Christopher L Coats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?