Koster v. Allstate Texas Lloyd's

Plaintiff: Robert Koster, MD
Defendant: Allstate Texas Lloyds
Case Number: 3:2019cv01450
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robert Koster, MD. (Peirce, Christopher)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER. The parties are to select or designate a mediator. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/3/2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/7/2019) (rekc)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set four-week docket beginning for 8/3/2020 before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. Joinder of Parties due by 11/5/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 11/5/2019. Motions due by 2/18/2020. Discovery due by 2/3/2020. Pretrial Order due by 7/6/2020. Pretrial Materials due by 7/6/2020. Status Report due by 11/5/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2020 02:30 PM before Judge Sam A. Lindsay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/7/2019) (rekc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Chastain, Lisa)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Joint Status Report due by 8/14/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/15/2019) (aaa)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 44th Judicial District, Dallas County, Texas, case number DC1905624 filed by Allstate Texas Lloyds. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10062714) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Chastain, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koster v. Allstate Texas Lloyd's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Texas Lloyds
Represented By: Lisa Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Koster, MD
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Peirce
Represented By: Jeffrey T Embry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?