Garrett et al v. BBVA Compass Bank et al

Plaintiff: Jane Runnels, Wanda Garett and Wanda Jean Garrett
Defendant: Cedric Brown, BBVA Compass Bank, Charles C Guimm, III, Walter Irvin, Ray McDonald and Cedric Brooks
Case Number: 3:2019cv01491
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam R Cummings
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Memorandum Opinion and Order: The plaintiffs' #10 motion to consolidate this case with action No. 3:19-CV-1213-N is DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/22/2019) (ykp)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 Motion to Dismiss.The plaintiffs have not filed proof of service on any defendant, and no defendant has answered or otherwise responded to the complaint. To the extent that the plaintiffs' filings may be construed as motions to dismiss any claims or counterclaims by the defendants, none have yet been asserted, so there is nothing before the Court to dismiss. Accordingly, any motions to dismiss are DEEMED MOOT. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/22/2019) (ykp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Request to Join 2 Cases filed by Wanda Jean Garrett, Jane Runnels. (epm)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Dismiss all counter claims by the defendant filed by Jane Runnels. (zkc)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Continue all claims and counterclaims made in his case and Dismiss all defendant claims because they are false and errenous filed by Jane Runnels. (zkc)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Dismiss all counter claims by the defendant filed by Wanda Jean Garrett. (zkc)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Continue all claims and counterclaims made in his case and Dismiss all defendent claims because they are false and errenous filed by Wanda Jean Garrett. (zkc)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Because they paid the fee, the plaintiffs are now responsible for serving each defendant with a summons and a copy of the complaint in this case as provided by Rule 4(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If each defendant is not served within 90 days after the filing of the complaint, the action is subject to dismissal without prejudice. In addition, Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l) requires the plaintiffs to file proof of service with the Court unless service is waived. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/25/2019) (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Copy of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4) (zkc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wanda Garett, Jane Runnels. (zkc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against BBVA Compass Bank, Cedric Brown, Charles C Guimm, III, Walter Irvin, Ray McDonald filed by Wanda Garett, Jane Runnels. (Filing fee $400.00; Receipt number DS117081) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc)
June 24, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 1, 2. Mon Jun 24 15:58:53 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett et al v. BBVA Compass Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Compass Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles C Guimm, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Runnels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Garett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Jean Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?