Altair Logix LLC v. Winsystems Inc

Plaintiff: Altair Logix LLC
Defendant: Winsystems, Inc. and Winsystems Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01524
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Dismissal. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (zkc)
August 16, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per #14 Notice of Dismissal. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (zkc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Altair Logix LLC (Johnson, Jay)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant WinSystems response to the complaint is due August 28, 2019. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 7/29/2019) (chmb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Winsystems Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition for Patent Infringement) (Thomas, Steven)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Winsystems Inc; served on 7/8/2019. (Johnson, Jay)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Bennett. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/28/2019) (chmb)
June 26, 2019 Judge David C Godbey added pursuant to Special Order 3-287. Judge Karen Gren Scholer no longer assigned to case. (ewd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney David R. Bennett (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-10074676) filed by Altair Logix LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Johnson, Jay)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Winsystems Inc. (mla)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mla)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Altair Logix LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by Altair Logix LLC (Johnson, Jay)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Altair Logix LLC. (Johnson, Jay) Modified title on 6/25/2019 (mla).
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Altair Logix LLC. (Johnson, Jay) Modified title on 6/25/2019 (mla).
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Winsystems Inc filed by Altair Logix LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10072882) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altair Logix LLC v. Winsystems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altair Logix LLC
Represented By: Jay B Johnson
Represented By: David R Bennett
Represented By: D Bradley Kizzia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winsystems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winsystems Inc
Represented By: Steven H. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?